Nunez v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Samantha Nunez
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00150
Filed: January 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company served on 1/17/2020, answer due 2/7/2020. (Sherwood, Christopher)
January 15, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (clw)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Summons. The pdf should not have the pink header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (clw)
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (aj)
January 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8086158) filed by Samantha Nunez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Allstate)Attorney Christopher H. Sherwood added to party Samantha Nunez(pty:pla).(Sherwood, Christopher) (Attachment 2 replaced on 1/15/2020) (clw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunez v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Nunez
Represented By: Christopher H. Sherwood
Represented By: Warren A. Forstall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?