Pearl v. Keqi et al
Plaintiff: Cameron Pearl
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Company, Roadrunner Charters, Inc., Safety Insurance Company, Jose Guerrero, Ren Keqi, William Dowie, Pennsylvania Manufacturers' Association Insurance Company and Unidentified Party
Case Number: 2:2020cv00160
Filed: January 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 3/26/2020 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (mmv)
February 18, 2020 Filing 19 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Indian Harbor Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent XL Group LTD, Corporate Parent XL Bermuda Ltd., Corporate Parent AXA Assurance Vie Mutuelle, Corporate Parent AXA SA, Corporate Parent XL Reinsurance America Inc., Corporate Parent XL Specialty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent X.L. America, Inc. for Indian Harbor Insurance Company (Albert, Andrea)
February 18, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Indian Harbor Insurance Company.(Albert, Andrea)
February 18, 2020 Filing 17 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by William Dowie, Ren Keqi, Safety Insurance Company (Moffett, Harry)
February 18, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by William Dowie, Ren Keqi, Safety Insurance Company.(Moffett, Harry) Modified text on 2/19/2020 (jeg).
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Enroll Additional Counsel of Record for Attorney Jennifer Moran Young for Indian Harbor Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 2/7/2020. (clw)
February 6, 2020 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Jennifer M. Young by Indian Harbor Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Albert, Andrea) Modified text on 2/7/2020 (jeg).
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER (No PDF Document Attached) re #10 Order to Show Cause. In light of Plaintiff's compliance with the Court's prior Order (R. Doc. 12), the Show Cause Hearing set for February 7, 2020, is hereby cancelled. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter. (fmm)
February 4, 2020 Filing 12 Memorandum by Cameron Pearl re #4 Order (Baer, Jason)
February 4, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Petition for Damages by Jose Guerrero, Pennsylvania Manufacturers' Association Insurance Company, Roadrunner Charters, Inc. (Ponder, Charles) Modified text on 2/5/2020 (jeg).
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: ORDERED that plaintiff, Cameron Pearl, shall appear and show cause on Friday, February 7, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. as to why Plaintiff has failed to comply with the Courts January 17, 2020 Order. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 1/31/2020.(jeg)
January 27, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 3/12/2020 2:00 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc)
January 24, 2020 Filing 8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Pennsylvania Manufacturers' Association Insurance Company, Roadrunner Charters, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Old Republic General Insurance Company, Inc., Corporate Parent Old Republic International Corporation, Corporate Parent PMA Companies, Inc. for Pennsylvania Manufacturers' Association Insurance Company (Ponder, Charles)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Seal Cameron Pearl's medical records into the record UNDER SEAL as an exhibit to Defendants' Memorandum and Supporting Evidence Regarding Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under 28 U.S.C. 1332 (R. Doc. 5). The exhibit shall remain under seal for the duration of this litigation. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 1/21/2020. (jeg)
January 20, 2020 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Seal Document #5 Memorandum, #4 Order by Jose Guerrero, Pennsylvania Manufacturers Association Insurance Comany, Roadrunner Charters, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Ponder, Charles)
January 20, 2020 Filing 5 Memorandum and Supporting Evidence Regarding Subject Matter Jurisdiction Under 28 U.S.C. 1332 by Jose Guerrero, Pennsylvania Manufacturers Association Insurance Comany, Roadrunner Charters, Inc. re #4 Order (Ponder, Charles) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2020: #1 Exhibit per Order rec doc 7) (jeg).
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the removing defendants, Jose Guerrero, Roadrunner Charters, Inc., and Pennsylvania Manufacturers' Association Insurance Company, shall have 10 days from the date of this Order to file a memorandum and supporting evidence concerning subject matter jurisdiction under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a). Plaintiff shall then have 10 days from the filing of the Defendants' memorandum to file a memorandum and supporting evidence regarding subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on January 16, 2020.(mp)
January 15, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Compliance with Rule 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) by Jose Guerrero, Pennsylvania Manufacturers Association Insurance Comany, Roadrunner Charters, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. (mp) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/17/2020: #1 List of Parties) (mp).
January 15, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go)
January 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, case number 2019-12253 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8088899) filed by Pennsylvania Manufacturers' Association Insurance Company, Jose Guerrero, Roadrunner Charters, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Plaintiff Counsels Cover Letter dated 12/3/19 with Citation and Petition for Damages to Defendant, Jose Guerrero, #2 Exhibit Concurrence in Removal - Indian Harbor Insurance Company, #3 Exhibit Concurrence in Removal - Ren Keqi, William Dowie, and Safety Insurance Company, #4 Exhibit Certificate of Compliance, #5 Exhibit List of Parties, #6 State Court Pleadings, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Charles Milton Ponder, III added to party Jose Guerrero(pty:dft), Attorney Charles Milton Ponder, III added to party Pennsylvania Manufacturers' Association Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Charles Milton Ponder, III added to party Roadrunner Charters, Inc.(pty:dft).(Ponder, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pearl v. Keqi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cameron Pearl
Represented By: Jason M. Baer
Represented By: Joshua A. Stein
Represented By: Casey Czajka DeReus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indian Harbor Insurance Company
Represented By: Jennifer Moran Young
Represented By: Andrea Leigh Albert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roadrunner Charters, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Milton Ponder, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety Insurance Company
Represented By: Harry McClellan Moffett, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Guerrero
Represented By: Charles Milton Ponder, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ren Keqi
Represented By: Harry McClellan Moffett, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Dowie
Represented By: Harry McClellan Moffett, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania Manufacturers' Association Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles Milton Ponder, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?