Mundy v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Deniser Mundy
Defendant: Alethia Williams, James River Insurance Company and GEICO Indemnity Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00197
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2020 11:00 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Jury Trial set for 10/26/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey.. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 3/12/20. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(jrc)
February 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 3/12/2020 10:15 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc)
January 31, 2020 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by James River Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent James River Insurance Company for James River Insurance Company (Jusczak, Derrick)
January 31, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance by James River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jusczak, Derrick)
January 21, 2020 Filing 4 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal. (clw)
January 21, 2020 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the pink header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (clw)
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (go)
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2019-08799 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8094627) filed by James River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Derrick A. Jusczak, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Notice of Removal Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Derrick A. Jusczak added to party James River Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Jusczak, Derrick) (Attachment 7 replaced on 1/21/2020) (clw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mundy v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alethia Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Represented By: Derrick A. Jusczak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deniser Mundy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?