Jones v. St. Bernard Parish Prison
Plaintiff: Dominique Antoine Jones
Defendant: St. Bernard Parish Prison
Case Number: 2:2020cv00377
Filed: January 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Susie Morgan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Having reviewed #4 Complaint filed by Dominique Antoine Jones, the Court notes that the sole defendant listed on the complaint is the "St. Bernard Parish Prison." The parish prison is an improper defendant. IT IS ORDERED that, on or before 3/31/2020, plaintiff file an Amended Complaint to name a proper defendant or defendants as set forth in document. If plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint as ordered, the undersigned will recommend that this lawsuit be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 3/10/2020.(ajn)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAUPER ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with a partial payment of $3.20 and directing the remainder of filing fee be made from Prisoner Account as to Dominique Antoine Jones in monthly payments as set out in document. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is DIRECTED to withhold issuance of summons until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 3/10/2020. (cc: Warden)(ajn)
March 9, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against St. Bernard Parish Prison filed by Dominique Antoine Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(sbs)
March 9, 2020 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Dominique Antoine Jones. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (sbs)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 2/27/2020. (clw)
January 31, 2020 Filing 1 **DEFICIENT** COMPLAINT against St. Bernard Parish Prison filed by Dominique Antoine Jones. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(clw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. St. Bernard Parish Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominique Antoine Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Bernard Parish Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?