Baker et al v. Statewide Transport, Inc.
Plaintiff: Wenyea Baker, Sammy Steadman, Antwuan Wilson and Arthur Capers
Defendant: Statewide Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00579
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Statewide Transport, Inc. by All Plaintiffs. (Bohrer, Philip)
February 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Sue by Wenyea Baker, Sammy Steadman . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bohrer, Philip) Modified text on 2/20/2020 (pp).
February 19, 2020 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Notice of Appearance, #3 Notice of Appearance. **Documents have been stricken. Notice of Appearance is not the proper form to request representation of a party. All attorneys listed on the Complaint have been added as counsel of record. No further action is necessary.** (pp)
February 19, 2020 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint.**Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Summons. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (pp)
February 19, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Statewide Transport, Inc. (pp)
February 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Sue by Wenyea Baker, Sammy Steadman . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bohrer, Philip) Modified text on 2/19/2020 (pp).
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 **STRICKEN**NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda E. McGowen on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney Amanda E. McGowen added to party Wenyea Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Amanda E. McGowen added to party Sammy Steadman(pty:pla).(McGowen, Amanda) Modified on 2/19/2020 (pp).
February 18, 2020 Filing 3 **STRICKEN** NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Brady on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Attorney Scott Brady added to party Wenyea Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Scott Brady added to party Sammy Steadman(pty:pla).(Brady, Scott) Modified on 2/19/2020 (pp).
February 18, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (cc)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Statewide Transport, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8153528) filed by Wenyea Baker, Sammy Steadman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Consent to Sue, #3 Exhibit Consent to Sue, #4 Summons)Attorney Philip Bohrer added to party Wenyea Baker(pty:pla), Attorney Philip Bohrer added to party Sammy Steadman(pty:pla).(Bohrer, Philip) (Attachment 4 replaced on 2/19/2020) (pp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker et al v. Statewide Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Statewide Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wenyea Baker
Represented By: Scott Brady
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Amanda E. McGowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sammy Steadman
Represented By: Scott Brady
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Amanda E. McGowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antwuan Wilson
Represented By: Scott Brady
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Amanda E. McGowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Capers
Represented By: Scott Brady
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Amanda E. McGowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?