Cerberus, L.L.C. et al v. Caruso et al
Plaintiff: Cerberus, L.L.C., Raymond L. Russo, Jr., Justin Bonura and Rocky Russo
Defendant: Nola Messenger, L.L.C., New Orleans Publishing Group, L.L.C., Specht Newspapers, Inc., Louisiana Business, Inc., Westmoreland Publishing Company, Inc., David Caruso, Renaissance Publishing LLC, Surplus Line Reporter Incorporated, Moran Printing, Inc., Thrive, L.L.C., Professional Insurance Agents of Louisiana, Incorporated, M & L Publishing, LLC, Independent Insurance Agents & Brokers of Louisiana, Inc., Kingfish Communications LLC, Lamar Company, LLC, Louisiana Construction and Industry Association, Agent C, L.L.C. and Redbird Publishing, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00707
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Thrive, L.L.C. on 3/9/2020, answer due 5/8/2020. (Lilly, Andrew)
March 23, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Westmoreland Publishing Company, Inc. on 3/14/2020, answer due 5/13/2020. (Lilly, Andrew)
March 23, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Lamar Company, LLC on 3/7/2020, answer due 5/6/2020. (Lilly, Andrew)
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Louisiana Construction and Industry Association on 3/2/2020, answer due 5/1/2020. (Lilly, Andrew)
March 16, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Agent C, L.L.C. on 3/2/2020, answer due 5/1/2020. (Lilly, Andrew)
March 16, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to David Caruso on 3/2/2020, answer due 5/1/2020. (Lilly, Andrew)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Judge Sarah S. Vance, Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 3/3/2020.(mm) (NEF: MJ(3), MJ(2))
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Cerberus, L.L.C. (Lilly, Andrew)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (aj)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8182951) filed by Raymond L. Russo, Jr, Cerberus, L.L.C., Justin Bonura. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet with Supplement, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)Attorney Andrew T. Lilly added to party Justin Bonura(pty:pla), Attorney Andrew T. Lilly added to party Cerberus, L.L.C. (pty:pla), Attorney Andrew T. Lilly added to party Raymond L. Russo, Jr(pty:pla).(Lilly, Andrew) Modified on 3/2/2020 (ko). (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/3/2020: #5 AO Form) (ko).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cerberus, L.L.C. et al v. Caruso et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nola Messenger, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Orleans Publishing Group, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specht Newspapers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Business, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westmoreland Publishing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Caruso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renaissance Publishing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surplus Line Reporter Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moran Printing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thrive, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Professional Insurance Agents of Louisiana, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M & L Publishing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent Insurance Agents & Brokers of Louisiana, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kingfish Communications LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamar Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Construction and Industry Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agent C, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redbird Publishing, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cerberus, L.L.C.
Represented By: Andrew T. Lilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond L. Russo, Jr.
Represented By: Andrew T. Lilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Bonura
Represented By: Andrew T. Lilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Russo
Represented By: Andrew T. Lilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?