Alexie v. Evenflo Company Inc
Plaintiff: Talise Alexie
Defendant: Evenflo Company Inc
Case Number: 2:2020cv00828
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Evenflo Company Inc on 3/24/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (Lemmon, Andrew)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Evenflo Company Inc. (mp)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8206326) filed by Talise Alexie. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Andrew Allen Lemmon added to party Talise Alexie(pty:pla).(Lemmon, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexie v. Evenflo Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evenflo Company Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Talise Alexie
Represented By: Andrew Allen Lemmon
Represented By: Scott Jourdan Falgoust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?