Reilly v. Edison Chouest Offshore, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Sean C. Reilly
Defendant: Edison Chouest Offshore, L.L.C., Offshore Service Vessels, L.L.C., Alaska Ventures, L.L.C. and Galliano Marine Service, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00844
Filed: March 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Michael North
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:30104
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #9 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Edison Chouest Offshore, LLC and Offshore Service Vessels, LLC are hereby dismissed from these proceedings, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 4/23/2020. (ajn)
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 5/11/2020 10:45 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc)
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Edison Chouest Offshore LLC and Offshore Service Vessels LLC by Sean C. Reilly. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ibert, Jessica)
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by Alaska Ventures, L.L.C., Galliano Marine Service, L.L.C..Attorney Colin B. Cambre added to party Alaska Ventures, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Colin B. Cambre added to party Galliano Marine Service, L.L.C.(pty:dft).(Cambre, Colin)
March 26, 2020 Filing 7 Third AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Sean C. Reilly.(Sterbcow, Paul) WITHHOLD SERVICE (ajn).
March 25, 2020 Filing 6 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Edison Chouest Offshore, L.L.C. filed by Sean C. Reilly.(Sterbcow, Paul) WITHHOLD SERVICE (ajn).
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Edison Chouest Offshore, L.L.C. served on 3/17/2020, answer due 4/7/2020. (Sterbcow, Paul)
March 12, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Edison Chouest Offshore, L.L.C. (ajn)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Edison Chouest Offshore, L.L.C. filed by Sean C. Reilly. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Sterbcow, Paul)
March 11, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
March 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Edison Chouest Offshore, L.L.C. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8208958) filed by Sean C. Reilly. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Paul M. Sterbcow added to party Sean C. Reilly(pty:pla).(Sterbcow, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reilly v. Edison Chouest Offshore, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edison Chouest Offshore, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Offshore Service Vessels, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Ventures, L.L.C.
Represented By: Taylor Michael Bologna
Represented By: Thomas Kent Ledyard Morrison
Represented By: Colin B. Cambre
Represented By: Michael J. Yenni, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galliano Marine Service, L.L.C.
Represented By: Taylor Michael Bologna
Represented By: Thomas Kent Ledyard Morrison
Represented By: Colin B. Cambre
Represented By: Michael J. Yenni, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean C. Reilly
Represented By: Paul M. Sterbcow
Represented By: Jessica Lynne Ibert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?