Briley v. Barreca et al
Plaintiff: Russell Andre Briley
Defendant: Ignatius Barreca, Jr., David Barreca, Sr. and Josephine Broadwater
Case Number: 2:2020cv00907
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to David Barreca, Sr, Ignatius Barreca, Jr, Josephine Broadwater. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (2 cc: Summons, Pauper Order, Pauper Letter, Complaints to Plaintiff via US Mail)(sa)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 3/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Pauper Letter) (sa)
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE Regarding Local Civil Rule 54.7(jls)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Russell Andre Briley. Motion(s) referred to Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (jls)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ignatius Barreca, Jr, Josephine Broadwater, David Barreca, Sr, filed by Russell Andre Briley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(jls)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Briley v. Barreca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Andre Briley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ignatius Barreca, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Barreca, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josephine Broadwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?