Dantzler, Inc. v. Intermarine, LLC
Plaintiff: Dantzler, Inc.
Defendant: Intermarine LLC and Zeamarine Americas, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00931
Filed: March 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Filing 25 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-24495. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (dw)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TRANSFERRING VENUE TO THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF LOUISIANA ; granting #23 Motion to Change Venue.; denying as moot #22 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 3/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (jao) [Transferred from flsd on 3/18/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION to Change Venue to the Eastern District of Louisiana by Dantzler, Inc.. Responses due by 3/27/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Arthur, Ethan) [Transferred from flsd on 3/18/2020.]
February 27, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #14 Amended Complaint, by Zeamarine Americas, LLC. Attorney Michael Damian Ruel added to party Zeamarine Americas, LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 3/12/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ruel, Michael) [Transferred from flsd on 3/18/2020.]
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Plaintiff's #20 Third Motion for Extension of Time to Hold Scheduling Conference. The Parties shall hold a scheduling conference on or before March 5, 2020. Within ten (10) days of the scheduling conference, counsel shall file a joint scheduling report. Failure of counsel to file a joint scheduling report within the deadlines set forth above may result in dismissal, default, and the imposition of other sanctions including attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 2/27/2020. (eca) [Transferred from flsd on 3/18/2020.]
February 27, 2020 Filing 20 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Hold Scheduling Conference by Dantzler, Inc.. Responses due by 3/12/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Arthur, Ethan) [Transferred from flsd on 3/18/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #14 Amended Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Dantzler, Inc.. Zeamarine Americas, LLC served on 2/6/2020, answer due 2/27/2020. (Arthur, Ethan) [Transferred from flsd on 3/18/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Plaintiff's #17 Second Motion for Extension of Time to Hold Scheduling Conference. The Parties shall hold a scheduling conference on or before February 27, 2020. Within ten (10) days of the scheduling conference, counsel shall file a joint scheduling report. Failure of counsel to file a joint scheduling report within the deadlines set forth above may result in dismissal, default, and the imposition of other sanctions including attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/29/2020. (eca) [Transferred from flsd on 3/18/2020.]
January 28, 2020 Filing 17 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Hold Scheduling Conference by Dantzler, Inc.. Responses due by 2/11/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Arthur, Ethan) [Transferred from flsd on 3/18/2020.]
January 28, 2020 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Zeamarine Americas, LLC. (scn) [Transferred from flsd on 3/18/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Zeamarine Americas, LLC by Dantzler, Inc. (Arthur, Ethan) [Transferred from flsd on 3/18/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 14 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against Intermarine, LLC, Zeamarine Americas, LLC, filed by Dantzler, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Certified translation of corrected judgment, #2 Exhibit 2-Certified translations of appellate court's decision and certificate of unappealability, #3 Exhibit 3-Certifies translation of the return of service on the letters rogatory)(Arthur, Ethan) [Transferred from flsd on 3/18/2020.]
January 8, 2020 Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra no longer assigned to case per DE #13 . (pes) [Transferred from flsd on 3/18/2020.]
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATION AND ORDER OF TRANSFER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley added. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 1/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (jv00) Modified on 1/10/2020 (bms). [Transferred from flsd on 3/18/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT to Judge Raag Singhal for all further proceedings, Chief Judge K. Michael Moore no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 01/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (yar) [Transferred from flsd on 3/18/2020.]
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Hold Scheduling Conference. #10 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion #10 is GRANTED. The Parties shall hold a scheduling conference on or before January 28, 2020. Within ten (10) days of the scheduling conference, counsel shall file a joint scheduling report. Failure of counsel to file a joint scheduling report within the deadlines set forth above may result in dismissal, default, and the imposition of other sanctions including attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 12/31/2019. (mgh) [Transferred from flsd on 3/18/2020.]
December 30, 2019 Filing 10 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to Hold Scheduling Conference by Dantzler, Inc.. Responses due by 1/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Arthur, Ethan) [Transferred from flsd on 3/18/2020.]
December 26, 2019 Filing 9 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons cannot be issued. The party on the summons does not match the initiating documents. (pes) [Transferred from flsd on 3/18/2020.]
December 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Zeamarine Americas, LLC by Dantzler, Inc. (Arthur, Ethan) [Transferred from flsd on 3/18/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dantzler, Inc. (Arthur, Ethan) [Transferred from flsd on 3/18/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACQUELINE BECERRA. PURSUANT to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-captioned Cause is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra to take all necessary and proper action as required by law with respect to any and all pretrial discovery matters. Any motion affecting deadlines set by the Court's Scheduling Order is excluded from this referral, unless specifically referred by separate Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall comply with Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra's discovery procedures. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 11/1/2019. (mgh) [Transferred from flsd on 3/18/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS PRETRIAL ORDER. This order has been entered upon the filing of the complaint. Plaintiff's counsel is hereby ORDERED to forward to all defendants, upon receipt of a responsive pleading, a copy of this Order. It is further ORDERED that S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1 shall apply to this case and the parties shall hold a scheduling conference no later than twenty (20) days after the filing of the first responsive pleading by the last responding defendant, or within sixty (60) days after the filing of the complaint, whichever occurs first. However, if all defendants have not been served by the expiration of this deadline, Plaintiff shall move for an enlargement of time to hold the scheduling conference, not to exceed 90 days from the filing of the Complaint. Within ten (10) days of the scheduling conference, counsel shall file a joint scheduling report. Failure of counsel to file a joint scheduling report within the deadlines set forth above may result in dismissal, default, and the imposition of other sanctions including attorney's fees and costs. The parties should note that the time period for filing a joint scheduling report is not tolled by the filing of any other pleading, such as an amended complaint or Rule 12 motion. The scheduling conference may be held via telephone. At the conference, the parties shall comply with the following agenda that the Court adopts from S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1: (1) Documents (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.1 and 2) - The parties shall determine the procedure for exchanging a copy of, or a description by category and location of, all documents and other evidence that is reasonably available and that a party expects to offer or may offer if the need arises. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(B). (a) Documents include computations of the nature and extent of any category of damages claimed by the disclosing party unless the computations are privileged or otherwise protected from disclosure. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(C). (b) Documents include insurance agreements which may be at issue with the satisfaction of the judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(D). (2) List of Witnesses - The parties shall exchange the name, address and telephone number of each individual known to have knowledge of the facts supporting the material allegations of the pleading filed by the party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A). The parties have a continuing obligation to disclose this information. (3) Discussions and Deadlines (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.2) - The parties shall discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case. Failure to comply with this Order or to exchange the information listed above may result in sanctions and/or the exclusion of documents or witnesses at the time of trial. S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.I. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit's Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court.Telephonic appearances are not permitted for any purpose. Upon reaching a settlement in this matter the parties are instructed to notify the Court by telephone and to file a Notice of Settlement within twenty-four (24) hours. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 11/1/2019. (mgh) [Transferred from flsd on 3/18/2020.]
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Intermarine, LLC. (pes) [Transferred from flsd on 3/18/2020.]
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Dantzler, Inc. (Cohen, Jordan) [Transferred from flsd on 3/18/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao) [Transferred from flsd on 3/18/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Intermarine, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12109147, filed by Dantzler, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cohen, Jordan) [Transferred from flsd on 3/18/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dantzler, Inc. v. Intermarine, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dantzler, Inc.
Represented By: Jordan Scott Cohen
Represented By: Ethan Alexander Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intermarine LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zeamarine Americas, LLC
Represented By: Michael Damian Ruel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?