Center for Biological Diversity, et al v. U.S. Department of Interior, et al
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity and Healthy Gulf
Defendant: U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service and U.S. Department of Interior
Not Classified By Court: U.S. Fish & Wildlife and David Bernhardt
Case Number: 2:2020cv00943
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 Summons Returned Executed as to USA or Agency of USA. **1. Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Affidavit of Service. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event. 2. Filing attorney entered incorrect service date for federal defendant U.S. Department of Interior. Correct service date is 4/3/2020 answer due 6/2/2020. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
April 7, 2020 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service Center for Biological Diversity, Healthy Gulf. U.S. Department of Interior served on 4/3/2020, answer due 6/2/2020; U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service served on 3/30/2020, answer due 5/29/2020 (Federal Defendants U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service and U.S. Department of Interior served thru the US Attorney General served on 3/30/2020; Federal Defendants U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service and U.S. Department of Interior served thru the US Attorney's Office for the EDLA on 3/28/2020) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service (1), #2 Exhibit Proof of Service (2))(Kurose, Stephanie) Modified text/event/service date on 4/8/2020 (jeg).
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ryan Adair Shannon. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 03/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ko)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Stephanie Kurose, as counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 3/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Pro Hac Notice) (sa)
March 23, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorney. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(pp)
March 20, 2020 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint.**Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Summons. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (pp)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Interior, U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(pp)
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephanie A. Kurose, #4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ryan A. Shannon. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the ECF registration form. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
March 19, 2020 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ryan A. Shannon (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8224962) by Center for Biological Diversity, Healthy Gulf. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, Certificate of Good Standing, and ECF Registration of Ryan A. Shannon, #2 Proposed Order)(Wiygul, Robert) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/20/2020) (jeg). Modified text/attachment description on 3/20/2020 (jeg).
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephanie A. Kurose (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8224452) by Center for Biological Diversity, Healthy Gulf. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, Certificate of Good Standing, and ECF Registration of Stephanie A. Kurose, #2 Proposed Order)(Wiygul, Robert) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/20/2020) (jeg). Modified attachment description on 3/20/2020 (jeg).
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Bernhardt, U.S. Fish & Wildlife (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8224381) filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Healthy Gulf. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons David Bernhardt, #3 Summons U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service)Attorney Robert Baxter Wiygul added to party Center for Biological Diversity(pty:selreq), Attorney Robert Baxter Wiygul added to party Healthy Gulf(pty:selreq).(Wiygul, Robert) (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/20/2020) (pp). (Attachment 3 replaced on 3/20/2020) (pp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity, et al v. U.S. Department of Interior, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Robert Baxter Wiygul
Represented By: Ryan Adair Shannon
Represented By: Stephanie Kurose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Healthy Gulf
Represented By: Robert Baxter Wiygul
Represented By: Ryan Adair Shannon
Represented By: Stephanie Kurose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: U.S. Fish & Wildlife
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: David Bernhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Fish & Wildlife Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Department of Interior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?