O'Dell v. Shore Construction, LLC
Plaintiff: Jackie O'Dell and Jackie D O'Dell
Defendant: Shore Construction, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00985
Filed: March 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:30104
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2020 11:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(ko)
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Answer to Complaint. **Filing attorney should have linked filing to Document 1. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
May 12, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Shore Construction, LLC. Attorney Kevin Andrew Marks added to party Shore Construction, LLC(pty:dft).(Marks, Kevin) Modified text/added linkage on 5/13/2020 (mm).
March 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Shore Construction, LLC. (cwa)
March 23, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
March 23, 2020 Filing 1 SEAMAN COMPLAINT with jury demand against Shore Construction, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CLAEDC-8228608) filed by Jackie O'Dell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney William Jared Vincent added to party Jackie O'Dell(pty:pla).(Vincent, William) Modified text on 3/24/2020 (cwa).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Dell v. Shore Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie O'Dell
Represented By: William Jared Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jackie D O'Dell
Represented By: William Jared Vincent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shore Construction, LLC
Represented By: Scott Robbert Huete
Represented By: Kevin Andrew Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?