Bourgeois v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Robert Bourgeois, II
Defendant: Underwriters At Lloyds London, Viking Pump, Inc., International Paper Company, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Cleaver-Brooks Sales & Services, Inc., Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Crane Co., Eagle, Inc., ConAgra Grocery Products Company, LLC, Flowserve US, Inc., McCarty Corporation, Lamorak Insurance Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Hopeman Brothers, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, CBS Corporation, Goulds Pumps, Incorporated, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London, Crane Company, Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Flowserve US Inc and Goulds Pumps LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Albert Bossier, Jr.
3Rd Party Defendant: Norman Jesse Smallwood, Uniroyal, Inc., Century Indemnity Company and Manville Personal Injury Trust
Cross Defendant: Claims Resolution Management Corporation and Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Case Number: 2:2020cv01002
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Filing 29 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Albert Bossier, Jr. (am)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER: GRANTING #24 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 5/18/2020. (am)
May 18, 2020 Filing 27 AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (am)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: GRANTING #23 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 5/18/2020. (am)
May 15, 2020 Filing 25 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #23 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses.**Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action.** (am)
May 15, 2020 Filing 24 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Albert Bossier, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proposed Pleading)(Melancon, David)
May 15, 2020 Filing 23 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement, #3 Proposed Order, #4 Proposed Pleading)(Gillen, Laura) Modified text/removed referral on 5/15/2020 (am).
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER AND REASONS: ORDERED that Bourgeois's #11 motion to remand is DENIED. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 5/14/2020. (clc)
May 8, 2020 Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Robert Bourgeois, II re #11 MOTION to Remand . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(am)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: GRANTING #18 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 5/8/2020. (am)
May 8, 2020 Filing 19 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher)
May 7, 2020 Filing 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand by Robert Bourgeois, II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading Reply memorandum in support of motion to remand, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Flanagan, Thomas)
May 6, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Albert Bossier, Jr, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #11 MOTION to Remand . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, Part 1, #10 Exhibit 9, Part 2, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25, #27 Exhibit 26, #28 Exhibit 27)(sa)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion for Leave to File Opposition in Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 5/5/2020. (sa)
May 4, 2020 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Opposition to Motion to Remand by Albert Bossier, Jr, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit)(Melancon, David)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #13 Motion to Continue the deadline for the Avondale Interests to file their Opposition to Plaintiff' s Motion to Remand. The deadline is extended from April 29, 2020 to May 4, 2020 at 12:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 4/24/2020. (clc)
April 23, 2020 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Deadline to File Opposition to Motion to Remand by Albert Bossier, Jr, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Melancon, David)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 4/23/2020. (am)
April 22, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand by Robert Bourgeois, II. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Placeholder, #2 Notice of Submission)(Flanagan, Thomas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2020: #3 Memorandum in Support, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Errata 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14, #18 Exhibit 15, #19 Exhibit 16, #20 Exhibit 17, #21 Exhibit 18, #22 Exhibit 19, #23 Exhibit 20, #24 Exhibit 21, #25 Exhibit 22, #26 Exhibit 23, #27 Exhibit 24, #28 Exhibit 25) (am). Added docs. oer rec. doc. 12. Modified on 4/23/2020 (am).
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Limit by Robert Bourgeois, II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25)(Flanagan, Thomas)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Enroll Attorney Thomas M. Flanagan,Anders F. Holmgren as Counsel of Record for Robert Bourgeois, II. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 4/21/2020. (clc)
April 21, 2020 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Additional Counsel by Robert Bourgeois, II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Thomas M. Flanagan added to party Robert Bourgeois, II(pty:pla).(Flanagan, Thomas)
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by International Paper Company (Penn, Elizabeth)
April 9, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Compliance by Albert Bossier, Jr, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #1 Notice of Removal,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Melancon, David)
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, by Goulds Pumps, Inc..Attorney Lauren Ann McCulloch Semlinger added to party Goulds Pumps, Inc.(pty:dft).(Semlinger, Lauren)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Lance M Africk recused. Case reassigned to Judge Barry W Ashe. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on March 26, 2020.(mp)
March 26, 2020 Filing 3 Directive of the Clerk re Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(b).(mp)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess)
March 25, 2020 Filing fee received from attorney David Melancon: Receipt no. LAE061023 $ 400.00 (go)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2019-3536 (Fee previously paid) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Albert Bossier, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Albert Bossier, Jr(pty:3pp), Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Albert Bossier, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Albert Bossier, Jr(pty:crc).(Melancon, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bourgeois v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Underwriters At Lloyds London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc.
Represented By: Colin Felicien Lozes
Represented By: James Matthew Matherne
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III
Represented By: Whitney Charmaine Stewart
Represented By: Erin Helen Boyd
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Grace, III
Represented By: Brian C. Bossier
Represented By: Laura M. Gillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks Sales & Services, Inc.
Represented By: Brett F. Willie
Represented By: Kevin John Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Richard J. Garvey, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle, Inc.
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ConAgra Grocery Products Company, LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Rutledge
Represented By: Robert Louis Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarty Corporation
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamorak Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Mathilde Villere Semmes
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Mathilde Villere Semmes
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Katherine Osborne Hannan
Represented By: Patricia Cowen Penton
Represented By: Kristopher T. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Company
Represented By: Lawrence G. Pugh, III
Represented By: Shelley L. Thompson
Represented By: Jacqueline Romero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps LLC
Represented By: Mitchell F Tedesco
Represented By: Lauren Ann McCulloch Semlinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Albert Bossier, Jr.
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Alex Tyler Robertson
Represented By: Daphne M. Lancaster
Represented By: Michael Kevin Powell
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bourgeois, II
Represented By: Mickey P. Landry
Represented By: Matthew C. Clark
Represented By: Philip C Hoffman
Represented By: Frank J. Swarr
Represented By: Anders F. Holmgren
Represented By: Thomas M. Flanagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Norman Jesse Smallwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Uniroyal, Inc.
Represented By: Amy Louise Maccherone
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Century Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Manville Personal Injury Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Claims Resolution Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?