Ambrose et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Patsy Ambrose and Ted Ambrose
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Not Classified By Court: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company - as UM carrier
Case Number: 2:2020cv01011
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Susie Morgan
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Acomb, William)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/10/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Susie Morgan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Susie Morgan. 3 day Jury Trial set for 3/22/2021 at 9:00 AM before Judge Susie Morgan. All discovery must be completed by 1/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(bwn)
May 12, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Acomb, William)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE - Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2020 at 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. Signed by Clerk.(bwn)
April 6, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Compliance by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Remova. (Acomb, William)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 DIRECTIVE OF THE CLERK regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. By the Clerk.(sbs)
March 26, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (aj)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 20-1329 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8233917) filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company - as UM carrier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)Attorney William Ryan Acomb added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company - as UM carrier(pty:selreq).(Acomb, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ambrose et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company - as UM carrier
Represented By: William Ryan Acomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patsy Ambrose
Represented By: Robert L. Manard, III
Represented By: Wendy Elise Manard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted Ambrose
Represented By: Robert L. Manard, III
Represented By: Wendy Elise Manard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: William Ryan Acomb
Represented By: Michael Benjamin Guerry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?