Verrett v. Pelican Waste and Debris, LLC
Plaintiff: Brandon Verrett
Defendant: Pelican Waste and Debris, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01035
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2020 10:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(ko)
May 19, 2020 Filing 19 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #18 Notice (Other). **Document does not contain Section and Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section T and Magistrate (4).** (mm)
May 18, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join by Brandon Verrett Kewin Knighten. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Kewin Knighten)(Alexander, William) Modified text on 5/19/2020 (mm).
April 30, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES to #1 Complaint by Pelican Waste and Debris, LLC. Attorney Thomas J. Cortazzo added to party Pelican Waste and Debris, LLC(pty:dft).(Cortazzo, Thomas)
April 27, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join Dione Southall by Brandon Verrett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent of Dione Southall)(Alexander, William) Modified text on 4/28/2020 (mm).
April 20, 2020 Filing 15 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #14 MOTION to Certify Class. **1. Filing attorney selected incorrect submission date. Correct date is 5/13/2020 before Judge Guidry. Clerk took corrective action. 2. The title of the attached proposed order should not include the word Proposed but only reflect Order on the actual document.** (mm)
April 20, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Certify Class by Brandon Verrett. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Brandon Verrett, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Erica Brown, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Sandra Green, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Lamark, #6 Exhibit Proposed Notice and Consent, #7 Exhibit Benzon v. National Oilwell Order, #8 Proposed Order, #9 Notice of Submission)(Alexander, William) Modified text/reset submission date on 4/20/2020 (mm).
April 20, 2020 Filing 13 DEFICIENT: MOTION to Certify Class by Brandon Verrett. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Brandon Verrett, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Erica Brown, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Sandra Green, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Lamark, #6 Exhibit Proposed Notice and Consent, #7 Exhibit Benzon v. National Oilwell Order, #8 Proposed Order)(Alexander, William) Modified text on 4/20/2020 (mm).
April 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join by Brandon Verrett Michael Terrell Lamark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Alexander, William) Modified text on 4/17/2020 (mm).
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Austin Winters Anderson. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 04/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ko)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to William Clifton Alexander. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 04/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (ko)
April 14, 2020 Filing 9 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Austin W. Anderson, #6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of William Clifton "Clif" Alexander. Document does not contain Section and/or Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section T and Magistrate (4). (cwa)
April 13, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Pelican Waste and Debris, LLC served on 4/9/2020, answer due 4/30/2020. (Bohrer, Philip)
April 13, 2020 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of Austin W. Anderson (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8257303) by Brandon Verrett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Bohrer, Philip)
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on Behalf of William Clifton "Clif" Alexander (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8257267) by Brandon Verrett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Bohrer, Philip)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join Erica Brown by Brandon Verrett . (Bohrer, Philip) Modified text on 4/8/2020 (mm).
March 30, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Pelican Waste and Debris, LLC. (mm)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (go)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Consent to Join by Brandon Verrett Sandra Green. (Bohrer, Philip) Modified text on 3/30/2020 (mm).
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Pelican Waste and Debris, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8236627) filed by Brandon Verrett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons) Attorney Philip Bohrer added to party Brandon Verrett(pty:pla).(Bohrer, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verrett v. Pelican Waste and Debris, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pelican Waste and Debris, LLC
Represented By: Thomas J. Cortazzo
Represented By: Caroline J Sanches
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Verrett
Represented By: Philip Bohrer
Represented By: Austin Winters Anderson
Represented By: William Clifton Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?