Synergy Bank v. Capt. T.W. Boudreaux M/V
Plaintiff: Synergy Bank
Defendant: Capt. T.W. Boudreaux M/V
Case Number: 2:2020cv01066
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:31325
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Filing 16 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #15 Request for Summons Issued. Summons is address to a defendant not currently named in this action. Pursuant to F.R.C.P 4, summons addressed to this non-party cannot be issued by the Court. (mp)
May 28, 2020 Filing 15 Request of Summons Issued as to GPS Marine, LLC filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint,. (Magee, Todd) Modified text on 5/29/2020 (mp).
May 14, 2020 Filing 14 WARRANT Returned Executed as to M/V Capt. T.W. Boudreaux on 5/8/2020. (mp)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Notice of Publication. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on May 13, 2020. (mp)
May 12, 2020 Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 NOTICE (other). Filing attorney selected incorrect event. Correct event is Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Clerk took corrective action by changing the event and modifying the text to reflect relief requested. (mp)
May 12, 2020 Filing 11 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Publication of Notice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Magee, Todd) Modified event on 5/12/2020 (mp).
May 7, 2020 Filing 10 WARRANT of Arrest of Vessel issued. (mp)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appoint/Substitute Custodian. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on May 7, 2020. (3cc: USM) (mp)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on May 7, 2020. (3cc: USM) (mp)
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appoint/Substitute Custodian by Synergy Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Magee, Todd) (3cc:USM)
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest in rem by Synergy Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Magee, Todd) (3cc: USM)
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 Minute Entry & Order: Status Conference held on 3/31/2020 before Judge Lance M Africk. IT IS ORDERED that the #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem and #3 Motion to Appoint/Substitute Custodian are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE, reserving Synergy the right to re-urge the same when the United States Marshals Service resumes full operations. (mp)
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (aj)
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appoint/Substitute Custodian by Synergy Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Substitute Custodian, #2 Proposed Order)(Magee, Todd)
March 31, 2020 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest in rem M/V Capt. T.W. Boudreaux by Synergy Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Magee, Todd)
March 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M.V Capt. T.W. Boudreaux (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8241683) filed by Synergy Bank. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit Verification, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A-Note, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B-FPSM)Attorney Todd M. Magee added to party Synergy Bank(pty:pla).(Magee, Todd) (3cc: USM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Synergy Bank v. Capt. T.W. Boudreaux M/V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synergy Bank
Represented By: Christopher H. Riviere
Represented By: Todd M. Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt. T.W. Boudreaux M/V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?