Rouse et al v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Sandra Rouse and Christopher Patterson Rouse
Defendant: LM General Insurance Company, Brandon Smith and Liberty Mutual Automobile Insurance
Case Number: 2:2020cv01123
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/25/2021 10:30 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey. Jury Trial set for 4/12/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Jay C. Zainey.. Signed by Judge Jay C. Zainey on 5/26/20. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(jrc)
May 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 5/26/2020 3:00 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. (jrc)
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by LM General Insurance Company, Brandon Smith.(Phayer, Kevin)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by LM General Insurance Company (Phayer, Kevin)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (aj)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th Judicial District Court, case number 804-457 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8249919) filed by LM General Insurance Company, Brandon Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Proposed Pleading, #4 Notice of 1447b Compliance, #5 Exhibit, #6 State Court Pleadings, #7 State Court Pleadings)Attorney Kevin T. Phayer added to party LM General Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin T. Phayer added to party Brandon Smith(pty:dft).(Phayer, Kevin) Modified text on 4/7/2020 (pp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rouse et al v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Rouse
Represented By: Michael Jay Begoun
Represented By: Nancy Seelig Silbert
Represented By: Mark R. Wolfe
Represented By: Becky S. Swantek
Represented By: Tilden Daniel Pick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Patterson Rouse
Represented By: Michael Jay Begoun
Represented By: Nancy Seelig Silbert
Represented By: Mark R. Wolfe
Represented By: Becky S. Swantek
Represented By: Tilden Daniel Pick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LM General Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin T. Phayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Smith
Represented By: Kevin T. Phayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Automobile Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?