Atkins v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Bridgette Atkins
Defendant: MCH Transportation Co., Kenneth Williams, Cherokee Insurance Company, MCH Transportation Company and Kenneth W Williams
Case Number: 2:2020cv01124
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Eldon E Fallon
2 Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown.(lag)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Status Conference set for 6/17/2020 08:30 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon by telephone. Jury Trial set for 3/8/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. All discovery must be completed by 1/25/2021. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Issued for the Court by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(ko)
April 27, 2020 Filing 8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Cherokee Insurance Company, MCH Transportation Company identifying Corporate Parent Trace Transport, Inc. for MCH Transportation Company; Corporate Parent Oakland Financial Group, Inc. for Cherokee Insurance Company (Sella, Eric)
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE: A PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE will be held BY TELEPHONE on THURSDAY, MAY 7, 2020, at 11:00AM, for the purpose of scheduling a pre-trial conference and trial on the merits and for a discussion of the status and discovery cut-off dates. Please use the following information to call in for the conference: Dial: 888-557-8511 Access code: 6655019. By Clerk.(jeg)
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk pursuant to 28 USC:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal filed by MCH Transportation Co., Cherokee Insurance Company, and Kenneth W Williams. By the Clerk.(jeg)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal. **1. Documents included name of minor in caption of case. If the involvement of a minor child must be mentioned, only the initials of that child should be used. Corrected document subsequently provided to Clerk, and image have been swapped. 2. Name of attorney who electronically filed this document does not match name of signatory attorney on pleading. The user log-in and password serve as the required signature for purposes of Rule 11 of the FRCP. No further action is necessary.** (jeg)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **1. Documents included name of minor in caption of case. If the involvement of a minor child must be mentioned, only the initials of that child should be used. Corrected documents subsequently provided to Clerk, and images have been swapped. 2. Name of attorney who electronically filed this document does not match name of signatory attorney on pleading. The user log-in and password serve as the required signature for purposes of Rule 11 of the FRCP. No further action is necessary.** (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 List of Parties, #9 List of Pleadings, #10 Exhibit 1) (jeg)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Answer to Petition for Damages with Jury Demand by Cherokee Insurance Company, MCH Transportation Co., Kenneth Williams.(Sella, Eric) (Main Document 3 replaced on 4/7/2020) (jeg). Modified text on 4/7/2020 (jeg).
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (aj)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from 21st Judicial District Court, Tangipahoa Parish, case number 2020-0296 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8249921) filed by Cherokee Insurance Company, MCH Transportation Co., Kenneth W Williams. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- State Court Pleading, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 List of Parties, #9 List of Pleadings, #10 Exhibit 1)Attorney Eric Winder Sella added to party Cherokee Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Eric Winder Sella added to party MCH Transportation Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Eric Winder Sella added to party Kenneth Williams(pty:dft).(Sella, Eric) (Main Document and Attachments 1-10 replaced on 4/7/2020) (jeg). Modified text on 4/7/2020 (jeg).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atkins v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCH Transportation Co.
Represented By: Eric Winder Sella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Williams
Represented By: Eric Winder Sella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherokee Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric Winder Sella
Represented By: Gerard J. Dragna
Represented By: Charles Michael Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCH Transportation Company
Represented By: Eric Winder Sella
Represented By: Gerard J. Dragna
Represented By: Charles Michael Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth W Williams
Represented By: Gerard J. Dragna
Represented By: Eric Winder Sella,
Represented By: Charles Michael Parks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgette Atkins
Represented By: Brad Rodney Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?