Parmley v. Amazon Studios, LLC
Plaintiff: Jodi Parmley
Defendant: Amazon Studios, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01127
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Samuel M. Bayard (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8335228) by Amazon Studios, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cert of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit, #3 Proposed Order)Attorney Mary Ellen Roy added to party Amazon Studios, LLC(pty:dft).(Roy, Mary Ellen)
April 10, 2020 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Amazon Studios, LLC on 4/10/2020, answer due 6/9/2020. (Hayes, DaShawn)
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (aj)
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8250220) filed by Jodi Parmley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney DaShawn Paul Hayes added to party Jodi Parmley(pty:pla).(Hayes, DaShawn) Modified text on 4/7/2020 (mm). (SERVICE BY WAIVER) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/7/2020: #2 AO 121 Form) (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parmley v. Amazon Studios, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Studios, LLC
Represented By: Mary Ellen Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi Parmley
Represented By: DaShawn Paul Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?