Gooding v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Co. et al
Plaintiff: James Grant Gooding, Helen Leupold, Martha Gooding and Caroline Pendergast
Defendant: Quality Shipyards, L.L.C., Delta Machine & Ironworks LLC, Dixie Machine Welding & Metal Works, Inc., Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, American Bureau of Shipping, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Eagle, Inc., Aetna Casualty & Surety Company, Boland Marine and Manufacturing Company, L.L.C., Chicago Insurance Company, CBS Corporation, McCarty Corporation, Foster Wheeler LLC, Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company, American Marine Corporation, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Sank, Inc., General Electric Company, Bayer CropScience, Bollinger Shipyards, LLC, Hopeman Brothers, Inc., Houston General Insurance Company, Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC, Fidelity & Casualty Insurance Company of New York, Interstate Fire & Casualty Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Maryland Casualty & Surety Company, Trinity Industries, Inc., IMO Industries Inc, Main Iron Works LLC, Continental Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company, Lamorak Insurance Company, International Paper Company, Swiftships Inc, Malcolm McLean, Swiftships, LLC, Chevron U.S.A., Inc., ViacomCBS Inc, Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, LLC and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company
3Rd Party Defendant: Chevron USA Inc, Uniroyal, Inc. and Manville Personal Injury Trust
Cross Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc., Sank Inc, Tidewater Inc, Hopeman Brothers Inc, Lloyd's, Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company, Fidelity and Casualty Insurance Company of New York, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London and Foster Wheeler, LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Albert Bossier and Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2020cv01133
Filed: April 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
2 Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER GRANTING #108 Motion for Extension of Time To File Responsive Pleadings. Defendant Chevron U.S.A. Inc.'s Responsive Pleadings to Third Party Plaintiffs Huntington Ingalls Inc. and Albert L. Bossier, Jr.'s Third Party Demands are due on or before 6/22/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 6/5/2020. (jls)
June 3, 2020 Filing 113 ANSWER to #29 Cross Claim of Albert Bossier by Chicago Insurance Company, Interstate Fire & Casualty Company.(Dietz, Julia) Modified text/linkage on 6/3/2020 (jls).
June 2, 2020 Filing 112 ANSWER to #29 Crossclaim of Albert Bossier with Jury Demand by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Devenport, Marc) Modified text/linkage on 6/3/2020 (jls).
June 2, 2020 Filing 111 ANSWER to #3 Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated with Jury Demand by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Devenport, Marc) Modified text on 6/3/2020 (jls).
June 2, 2020 Filing 110 ANSWER to #38 First Supplemental & Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Zurich American Insurance Company.(Devenport, Marc) Modified text on 6/3/2020 (jls).
June 2, 2020 Filing 109 ANSWER to #3 Third Party Claim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Uniroyal, Inc. Attorney Mary Reeves Arthur added to party Uniroyal, Inc.(pty:3pd), Attorney Mary Reeves Arthur added to party Uniroyal, Inc.(pty:3pd).(Arthur, Mary) Modified text on 6/3/2020 (jls).
June 1, 2020 Filing 108 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #3 Third Party Complaint of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated and and #29 Third Party Complaint of Albert L. Bossier, by Chevron USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Michael H. Abraham added to party Chevron USA Inc(pty:3pd).(Abraham, Michael) Modified text on 6/1/2020 (jls).
June 1, 2020 Filing 107 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Chevron U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Chevron Corporation, Corporate Parent Chevron USA Holdings, Inc. for Chevron U.S.A., Inc. (Abraham, Michael)
May 29, 2020 Filing 106 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue , Without Date, Submission Date of Swiftships Motions for Summary Judgment (rec. docs. 92 and 98) by Albert Bossier, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, and by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Powell, Michael) Modified yexy on 6/1/2020 (jls).
May 28, 2020 Filing 105 ANSWER to #3 Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney Brittney Bullock Ankersen added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(pty:crd).(Ankersen, Brittney) Modified text on 5/29/2020 (jls).
May 28, 2020 Filing 104 ANSWER to #3 CrossClaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. Attorney Brittney Bullock Ankersen added to party Hopeman Brothers, Inc.(pty:crd).(Ankersen, Brittney) Modified text on 5/29/2020 (jls).
May 28, 2020 Filing 103 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal and #38 First Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. Attorney Brittney Bullock Ankersen added to party Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Ankersen, Brittney) Modified text/linkage on 5/29/2020 (jls).
May 28, 2020 Filing 102 ANSWER to #38 First Supplemental & Amended Complaint, by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. (Ankersen, Brittney) Modified text on 5/29/2020 (jls).
May 28, 2020 Filing 101 ANSWER to #3 Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Chicago Insurance Company, Interstate Fire & Casualty Company.(Dietz, Julia) Modified text on 5/29/2020 (jls).
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING #93 Partial Dismissal Without Prejudice. Huntington Ingalls Inc. and Albert L. Bossier, Jr.'s cross-claims against Houston General Insurance Company are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 5/28/2020. (jls)
May 27, 2020 Filing 99 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Cross Defendant The Continental Insurance Company by Albert Bossier (rec. doc. 29), and by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (rec. doc. 3). (Powell, Michael) Modified text on 5/28/2020 (jls).
May 27, 2020 Filing 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Swiftships, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #3 Affidavit, #4 Affidavit, #5 Notice of Submission)(LaRocca, Nicholas) Modified text on 5/27/2020 (jls).
May 26, 2020 Filing 97 MEMORANDUM filed by All Plaintiffs re #81 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(6) . (Centola, Lawrence)
May 22, 2020 Filing 96 STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice as to The Continental Insurance Company as alleged insurer for Marquette Insulations Inc. by All Plaintiffs (Centola, Lawrence)
May 22, 2020 Filing 95 ANSWER to #38 First Supplemental and Amended Complaint, and First Supplemental and Amended CROSSCLAIM against Swiftships, LLC by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(Melancon, David) Modified text on 5/26/2020 (jls).
May 22, 2020 Filing 94 ANSWER to #38 First Supplemental and Amended Complaint, and First Supplemental and Amended CROSSCLAIM against Swiftships, LLC by Albert Bossier.(Melancon, David) Modified text on 5/26/2020 (jls).
May 22, 2020 Filing 93 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Huntington Ingalls Incorporated and Albert L. Bossier's cross-claims against Party Houston General Insurance Company by Albert Bossier, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Melancon, David) Modified text on 5/26/2020 (jls).
May 21, 2020 Filing 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Swiftships, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #5 Notice of Submission)(LaRocca, Nicholas)
May 19, 2020 Filing 91 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, #38 First Supplemental and Amended Complaint, by Travelers Indemnity Company. (Wilson, Kristopher) Modified text on 5/19/2020 (jls).
May 18, 2020 Filing 90 ANSWER to #38 First Supplemental and Amended Complaint, by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher) Modified text on 5/19/2020 (jls).
May 14, 2020 Filing 89 **DEFICIENT** MOTION for Summary Judgment by Swiftships, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts)(LaRocca, Nicholas) Modified on 5/15/2020 (jls).
May 14, 2020 Filing 88 ANSWER to #29 Crossclaim of Albert Bossier, Jr. by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Travelers Indemnity Company.(Reimonenq, Simeon) Modified text on 5/15/2020 (jls).
May 14, 2020 Filing 87 ANSWER to #3 Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Travelers Indemnity Company.(Reimonenq, Simeon) Modified text on 5/15/2020 (jls).
May 14, 2020 Filing 86 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal and #38 First Supplemental and Amended Complaint, by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Travelers Indemnity Company.(Reimonenq, Simeon) Modified text on 5/15/2020 (jls).
May 13, 2020 Filing 85 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by IMO Industries Inc identifying Corporate Parent Colfax Corporation, Corporate Parent CLFX LLC, Corporate Parent IMO Holdings, Inc. for IMO Industries Inc (Porteous, Thomas)
May 12, 2020 Filing 84 ANSWER to #29 Crossclaim of Albert L. Bossier, Jr. by IMO Industries, Inc. Attorney Thomas A. Porteous added to party IMO Industries, Inc.(pty:crd).(Porteous, Thomas) Modified text/linkage on 5/13/2020 (jls).
May 12, 2020 Filing 83 ANSWER to #3 Answer and Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by IMO Industries, Inc. Attorney Thomas A. Porteous added to party IMO Industries, Inc.(pty:crd).(Porteous, Thomas) Modified text on 5/13/2020 (jls).
May 12, 2020 Filing 82 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal and to #38 First Supplemental and Amended Complaint, by IMO Industries Inc. Attorney Thomas A. Porteous added to party IMO Industries Inc(pty:dft).(Porteous, Thomas) Modified text on 5/13/2020 (jls).
May 12, 2020 Filing 81 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rules 12(b)(6) by Dixie Machine Welding & Metal Works, Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Notice of Submission)Attorney Jade M. Wandell added to party Dixie Machine Welding & Metal Works, Inc.(pty:dft).(Wandell, Jade) Modified text on 5/13/2020 (jls).
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER GRANTING #69 Partial Dismissal Without Prejudice. All of Plaintiffs' claims against Houston General Insurance Company are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 5/11/2020.(jls)
May 11, 2020 Filing 79 ANSWER to #38 First Supplemental and Amended Complaint by International Paper Company. (Penn, Elizabeth) Modified text on 5/11/2020 (jls).
May 11, 2020 Filing 78 ANSWER to #3 Answer and Cross-Claim and Third-Party Demand of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher) Modified text on 5/11/2020 (jls).
May 11, 2020 Filing 77 ANSWER to #29 Crossclaim and Third-Party Demand of Albert L. Bossier, Jr. by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher) Modified text on 5/11/2020 (jls).
May 11, 2020 Filing 76 ANSWER to Petition for Damages re #1 Notice of Removal by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher) Modified text on 5/11/2020 (jls).
May 11, 2020 Filing 75 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to SwiftShips, LLC on 4/20/2020, answer due 6/19/2020. (Centola, Lawrence) Modified text on 5/11/2020 (jls).
May 8, 2020 Filing 74 ANSWER to #29 Crossclaim of Albert L. Bossier, Jr. by Sank, Inc. (Radecker, H.) Modified text/linkage on 5/11/2020 (jls).
May 8, 2020 Filing 73 ANSWER to #3 Answer and Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Sank Inc. Attorney H. Philip Radecker, Jr added to party Sank Inc(pty:crd).(Radecker, H.) Modified text on 5/11/2020 (jls).
May 8, 2020 Filing 72 ANSWER to #38 First Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Sank, Inc. (Radecker, H.) Modified text on 5/11/2020 (jls).
May 8, 2020 Filing 71 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher)
May 8, 2020 Filing 70 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. (Ankersen, Brittney) Modified text on 5/8/2020 (jls).
May 7, 2020 Filing 69 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Partial Dismissal without Prejudice, of Houston General Insurance Company by Martha Gooding, Helen Leupold, Caroline Pendergast. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Centola, Lawrence) Modified text/filers on 5/8/2020 (jls).
May 7, 2020 Filing 68 ANSWER to #38 First Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Quality Shipyards, L.L.C., and Tidewater, Inc.(Flint, Delos) Modified text on 5/8/2020 (jls).
May 7, 2020 Filing 67 ANSWER to #29 Cross-Claim of Albert L. Bossier, Jr. by Quality Shipyards, L.L.C., Tidewater Inc. Attorney Delos E. Flint, Jr added to party Tidewater Inc(pty:crd).(Flint, Delos) Modified text/added linkage on 5/8/2020 (jls).
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING #25 Motion for Joinder in the Avondale Interests' Notice of Removal. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 5/7/2020. (jls)
May 7, 2020 Filing 65 ANSWER to #29 Crossclaim of Albert L. Bossier, Jr. by Foster Wheeler LLC. Attorney Angela M. Bowlin added to party Foster Wheeler LLC(pty:crd).(Bowlin, Angela) Modified text/linkage on 5/8/2020 (jls).
May 7, 2020 Filing 64 ANSWER to #29 Crossclaim, of Albert L. Bossier, Jr. by General Electric Company. Attorney Angela M. Bowlin added to party General Electric Company(pty:crd).(Bowlin, Angela) Modified text/linkage on 5/8/2020 (jls).
May 7, 2020 Filing 63 ANSWER to #29 Crossclaim of Albert L. Bossier, Jr. by ViacomCBS Inc. Attorney Angela M. Bowlin added to party CBS Corporation(pty:crd).(Bowlin, Angela) Modified text/filer/linkage on 5/8/2020 (jls).
May 7, 2020 Filing 62 ANSWER to Cross-Claim of Albert L. Bossier, Jr. included in #29 Notice of Compliance, by United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company. (Wilson, Kristopher) Modified text/linkage on 5/7/2020 (jls).
May 7, 2020 Filing 61 ANSWER to #3 Answer and Crossclaim, of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company. (Wilson, Kristopher) Modified text on 5/7/2020 (jls).
May 7, 2020 Filing 60 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal and #38 First Supplemental and Amended Complaint, by United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company.(Wilson, Kristopher) Modified text on 5/7/2020 (jls).
May 7, 2020 Filing 59 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Chicago Insurance Company, Interstate Fire & Casualty Company.(Dietz, Julia) Modified text on 5/7/2020 (jls).
May 7, 2020 Filing 58 ANSWER to #3 Answer and Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, by Bayer CropScience.(Stein, David) Modified text on 5/7/2020 (jls).
May 7, 2020 Filing 57 ANSWER to Cross-Claim of Albert L. Bossier, Jr. included in #29 Notice of Compliance, by Bayer CropScience.(Stein, David) Modified text on 5/7/2020 (jls).
May 7, 2020 Filing 56 ANSWER to #38 First Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Bayer CropScience. Attorney David M. Stein added to party Bayer CropScience(pty:crd), Attorney David M. Stein added to party Bayer CropScience(pty:crd).(Stein, David) Modified text on 5/7/2020 (jls).
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER GRANTING #40 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. Chicago Insurance Company and Interstate Fire & Casualty Company are granted an additional 21 days from the date of this Order to file responsive pleadings or otherwise respond to the Petition in the above-captioned matter. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 5/5/2020. (jls)
May 5, 2020 Filing 54 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Swiftships, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Swiftships Group, Inc. for Swiftships, LLC (LaRocca, Nicholas)
May 5, 2020 Filing 53 ANSWER to #38 First Supplemental & Amended Complaint, #1 Notice of Removal, by Swiftships, LLC. Attorney Nicholas F. LaRocca, Jr added to party Swiftships, LLC(pty:dft).(LaRocca, Nicholas) Modified text on 5/6/2020 (jls).
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER OF RECUSAL - My son-in-law, T. Patrick O'Leary, is a partner of the Frilot, L.L.C. firm, which represents several defendants in this matter. Accordingly, I am required to recuse myself from this matter. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 5/4/2020. (NEF: Mag. 3) (sa)
April 30, 2020 Filing 51 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Foster Wheeler LLC identifying Corporate Parent John Wood Group PLC for Foster Wheeler LLC (Bowlin, Angela)
April 30, 2020 Filing 50 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by General Electric Company (Bowlin, Angela)
April 30, 2020 Filing 49 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by CBS Corporation identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc. for CBS Corporation (Bowlin, Angela)
April 30, 2020 Filing 48 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Foster Wheeler LLC.Attorney Angela M. Bowlin added to party Foster Wheeler LLC(pty:dft).(Bowlin, Angela) Modified text on 5/1/2020 (cwa).
April 30, 2020 Filing 47 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by General Electric Company.Attorney Angela M. Bowlin added to party General Electric Company(pty:dft).(Bowlin, Angela) Modified text on 5/1/2020 (cwa).
April 30, 2020 Filing 46 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by ViacomCBS Inc. Attorney Angela M. Bowlin added to party CBS Corporation(pty:dft).(Bowlin, Angela) Modified text on 5/1/2020 (cwa). Modified filer on 5/5/2020 (jls).
April 29, 2020 Filing 45 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #42 ANSWER to Complaint, CROSSCLAIM against Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. **(1) Filing attorney should have selected "No" when asked "Does this filing include a cross-claim?" This document is an Answer to a Crossclaim, not an Answer and Crossclaim. Clerk took corrective action. **(2) Filing attorney did not select Tidewater, Inc. as a filer. Clerk added filer. **(3) Filing attorney should have linked document to the document being answered (rec. doc. 3). Clerk properly linked document to rec. doc. 3. No further action is necessary.** (jls)
April 29, 2020 Filing 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Foster Wheeler LLC on 4/16/2020, answer due 6/15/2020. (Centola, Lawrence) Modified text/answer deadline on 4/29/2020 (jls).
April 29, 2020 Filing 42 ANSWER to #3 Crossclaim by Quality Shipyards, L.L.C. and Tidewater, Inc. Attorney Delos E. Flint, Jr added to party Quality Shipyards, L.L.C.(pty:crd).(Flint, Delos) Modified event/text/filers/linkage on 4/29/2020 (jls).
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company and Travelers Indemnity Company shall file its Answer on or before 5/15/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 4/28/2020. (jls)
April 27, 2020 Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Chevron U.S.A., Inc. on 4/20/2020, answer due 6/19/2020. (McLaughlin, Margaret)
April 27, 2020 Filing 40 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Chicago Insurance Company, Interstate Fire & Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dietz, Julia)
April 27, 2020 Filing 39 ANSWER to #38 First Supplemental and Amended Complaint by Lamorak Insurance Company.(Rosamond, Samuel) Modified text on 4/28/2020 (jls).
April 24, 2020 Filing 37 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #33 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. Filing attorney did not enter Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allianz of America, Inc., Allianz Europe B.V., Allianz SE, AGCS International Holding B.V., Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty SE as corporate parents for Interstate Fire & Casualty Company at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action. ** (jls)
April 24, 2020 Filing 36 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #32 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **Filing attorney did not enter Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allianz of America, Inc., Allianz Europe B.V., Allianz SE, AGCS International Holding B.V., Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty SE, and Allianz SE as corporate parents at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action.** (jls)
April 23, 2020 Filing 38 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL & AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Martha Gooding, Caroline Pendergast, Helen Leupold.(lag)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER GRANTING #27 Motion for Leave to File First Supplemental and Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 4/23/2020. (jls)
April 23, 2020 Filing 34 **DEFICIENT** WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Foster Wheeler LLC on 4/23/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Centola, Lawrence) Modified on 4/24/2020 (jls).
April 23, 2020 Filing 33 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Interstate Fire & Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parents Fireman's Fund Ins. Co., Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allianz of America, Inc., Allianz Europe B.V., Allianz SE, AGCS International Holding B.V., Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty SE for Interstate Fire & Casualty Company (Dietz, Julia) Modified text/added corporate parents on 4/24/2020 (jls).
April 23, 2020 Filing 32 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Chicago Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parents Fireman's Fund Ins. Co., Allianz Global Risks US Insurance Company, Allianz of America, Inc., Allianz Europe B.V., Allianz SE, AGCS International Holding B.V., Allianz Global Corporate & Specialty SE, and Allianz SE for Chicago Insurance Company (Dietz, Julia) Modified text/added corporate parents on 4/24/2020 (jls).
April 23, 2020 Filing 31 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, #27 MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental and Amended Complaint for Damages by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Reimonenq, Simeon) Modified text on 4/23/2020 (jls).
April 22, 2020 Filing 30 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re Notice of Removal, MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental and Amended Complaint for Damages by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order)(Reimonenq, Simeon) Modified text/linkage on 4/23/2020 (jls).
April 22, 2020 Filing 29 Notice of Compliance by Albert Bossier, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated pursuant to #7 Directive re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings Part 1, #2 State Court Pleadings Part 2)(Melancon, David) Modified text on 4/22/2020 (jls).
April 21, 2020 Filing 28 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. (Ankersen, Brittney)
April 20, 2020 Filing 27 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental and Amended Complaint for Damages by James Grant Gooding. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading First Supplemental and Amended Complaint for Damages)Attorney Lawrence J. Centola, III added to party Martha Gooding(pty:pla), Attorney Lawrence J. Centola, III added to party Helen Leupold(pty:pla), Attorney Lawrence J. Centola, III added to party Caroline Pendergast(pty:pla).(Centola, Lawrence) Modified text/filers on 4/20/2020 (jls).
April 17, 2020 Filing 26 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by International Paper Company (Penn, Elizabeth)
April 17, 2020 Filing 25 Consent and Joinder as plaintiff by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. in the avondale Interests' Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A-H)Attorney Brittney Bullock Ankersen added to party Hopeman Brothers, Inc.(pty:dft).(Ankersen, Brittney) Modified event/text on 4/20/2020 (jls).
April 16, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER to #3 Answer and Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by International Paper Company. (Penn, Elizabeth) Modified text on 4/17/2020 (jls).
April 16, 2020 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Answer to Cross-Claims of Albert L. Bossier, Jr., by International Paper Company. Attorney Elizabeth Riddell Penn added to party International Paper Company(pty:crd).(Penn, Elizabeth) Modified text on 4/17/2020 (jls).
April 16, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand by Zurich American Insurance Company. Attorney Marc E. Devenport added to party Zurich American Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Devenport, Marc) Modified text on 4/16/2020 (jls).
April 15, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Bayer CropScience. Attorney David M. Stein added to party Bayer CropScience(pty:dft), Attorney David M. Stein added to party Bayer CropScience(pty:crd).(Stein, David) Modified text on 4/16/2020 (jls).
April 15, 2020 Filing 20 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Bayer CropScience identifying Corporate Parents Bayer CropScience Holding SA and Bayer AG for Bayer CropScience, Bayer CropScience (Stein, David) Modified on 4/16/2020 (jls).
April 14, 2020 Filing 19 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #16 Summons Submitted for Issuance. **(1) Filing attorney attached summons forms for four additional parties that were not named defendants in the Crossclaim. Clerk was only able to issue summons for the 39 named defendants in the pleading at rec. doc. 3. **(2) Filing attorney improperly listed the name of the 3rd party plaintiff as Albert Bossier on the 3rd party summons forms. Clerk corrected summons to reflect the filer of the Third-Party Complaint, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. No further action necessary.** (jls)
April 14, 2020 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Aetna Casualty & Surety Company, American Bureau of Shipping, American Marine Corporation, Bayer CropScience, Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company, Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC, Boland Marine and Manufacturing Company, L.L.C., Bollinger Shipyards, LLC, CBS Corporation, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, Chicago Insurance Company, Continental Insurance Company, Delta Machine & Ironworks LLC, Dixie Machine Welding & Metal Works, Inc., Eagle, Inc., Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Fidelity & Casualty Insurance Company of New York, Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hopeman Brothers, Inc., Houston General Insurance Company, IMO Industries, Inc., International Paper Company, Interstate Fire & Casualty Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Main Iron Works LLC, Maryland Casualty & Surety Company, McCarty Corporation, Malcolm McLean, Quality Shipyards, L.L.C., Sank Inc, Swiftships Inc, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Tidewater Inc, Travelers Indemnity Company, Trinity Industries, Inc., United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company, Zurich American Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons, #14 Summons, #15 Summons, #16 Summons, #17 Summons, #18 Summons, #19 Summons, #20 Summons, #21 Summons, #22 Summons, #23 Summons, #24 Summons, #25 Summons, #26 Summons, #27 Summons, #28 Summons, #29 Summons, #30 Summons, #31 Summons, #32 Summons, #33 Summons, #34 Summons, #35 Summons, #36 Summons, #37 Summons, #38 Summons)(jls)
April 14, 2020 Filing 17 Summons on Third Party Complaint Issued as to Chevron USA Inc, Manville Personal Injury Trust, Uniroyal, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(jls)
April 13, 2020 Filing 16 Summons Submitted for Issuance (Attachments: #1 Summons Aetna, #2 Summons American Bureau of Shipping, #3 Summons American Marine Corporation, #4 Summons Bayer Cropsciece, #5 Summons Berkshire Hathaway, #6 Summons Boland Marine & Industrial, #7 Summons Boland Martine & Manufacturing, #8 Summons Bollinger Shipyards, #9 Summons CBS Corporation, #10 Summons Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, #11 Summons Chevron USA Inc., #12 Summons Chicago Insurance Company, #13 Summons Continental Insurance Company, #14 Summons Delta Machine, #15 Summons Dixie Machine, #16 Summons Eagle, #17 Summons Employers Indurance Company, #18 Summons Fidelity & Casualty Insurance Company, #19 Summons Foster Wheeler LLC, #20 Summons General Electric Company, #21 Summons Hartford Insurance, #22 Summons Hopeman Brothers Inc., #23 Summons Houston General, #24 Summons IMO Industries, #25 Summons International Paper, #26 Summons Interstate Fire, #27 Summons Lloyds, #28 Summons Main Iron Works, #29 Summons Manville PI Settlement Trust, #30 Summons Maryland Casualty, #31 Summons McCarty, #32 Summons Malcolm McLean, #33 Summons Quality Shipyards, #34 Summons Sank, Inc., #35 Summons Swiftships, #36 Summons Taylor-Seidenbach, #37 Summons Tidewater, #38 Summons Travelers, #39 Summons Trinity industries, #40 Summons Uniroyal, Inc., #41 Subpoena USF&G, #42 Summons Zurich American Insurance, #43 Summons Chevron USA Inc - Third Party, #44 Summons Manville PI Trust - Third Party, #45 Summons Uniroyal - Third Party)(Melancon, David)
April 13, 2020 Filing 15 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company for United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company (Wilson, Kristopher)
April 13, 2020 Filing 14 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company f/k/a The Aetna Casualty and Surety Company and Travelers Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp. for Travelers Indemnity Company and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company. (Reimonenq, Simeon) Modified text on 4/14/2020 (jls).
April 13, 2020 Filing 13 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Travelers Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp. for Travelers Indemnity Company (Wilson, Kristopher)
April 10, 2020 Filing 12 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Huntington Ingalls Industries, Inc. for Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (Melancon, David)
April 9, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, LLC. Attorney H. Philip Radecker, Jr added to party Bollinger Shipyards, LLC(pty:dft).(Radecker, H.) Modified filer/text on 4/9/2020 (jls).
April 9, 2020 Filing 10 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, LLC (Radecker, H.) Modified filer/text on 4/9/2020 (jls).
April 9, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, by Sank, Inc. Attorney H. Philip Radecker, Jr added to party Sank, Inc.(pty:dft).(Radecker, H.) Modified text on 4/9/2020 (jls).
April 9, 2020 Filing 8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Sank, Inc. (Radecker, H.)
April 8, 2020 Filing 7 DIRECTIVE OF THE CLERK regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company. By the Clerk. (jls)
April 8, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, as alleged insurer of Eagle by Lamorak Insurance Company. (Rosamond, Samuel) Modified text on 4/8/2020 (jls).
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, as alleged insurer of Avondale by Lamorak Insurance Company. (Rosamond, Samuel) Modified text on 4/8/2020 (jls).
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Lamorak Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Bedivere Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Trebuchet Investments, Limited, Corporate Parent Armour Group Holdings, Limited, Corporate Parent Trebuchet US Holdings, Inc. for Lamorak Insurance Company (Rosamond, Samuel)
April 7, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against Aetna Casualty & Surety Company, American Bureau of Shipping, American Marine Corporation, Bayer CropScience, Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company, Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC, Boland Marine & Manufacturing Co, Bollinger Shipyards, LLC, CBS Corporation, Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London, Chicago Insurance Company, Continental Insurance Company, Delta Machine & Ironworks LLC, Dixie Machine Welding & Metal Works, Inc., Eagle, Inc., Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Fidelity and Casualty Company of New York, Foster Wheeler LLC, General Electric Company, Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company, Hopeman Brothers, Inc., Houston General Insurance Company, IMO Industries, Inc., International Paper Company, Interstate Fire & Casualty Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, as Insurer of Wayne Manufacturing, Main Iron Works LLC, Maryland Casualty & Surety Company, McCarty Corporation, Malcolm McLean, Quality Shipyards, L.L.C., Sank Inc, Swiftships Inc, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Tidewater Inc, Travelers Indemnity Company, Trinity Industries, Inc., United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company, Zurich American Insurance Company, and THIRD PARTY CLAIM against Uniroyal, Inc., Manville Personal Injury Trust, and Chevron U.S.A. Inc., filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(Melancon, David) Modified text/filers on 4/7/2020 (jls).
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (aj)
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2020-2147 M-13 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8251442) filed by Lamorak Insurance Company, Albert Bossier, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Albert L. Bossier, Jr.(pty:3pp), Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Albert L. Bossier, Jr.(pty:crc), Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Albert L. Bossier, Jr.(pty:dft), Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft).(Melancon, David) Modified text on 4/7/2020 (jls). Modified on 4/7/2020 (jls).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gooding v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Shipyards, L.L.C.
Represented By: Destinee Finnin Ramos
Represented By: Delos E. Flint, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Machine & Ironworks LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dixie Machine Welding & Metal Works, Inc.
Represented By: Jade M. Wandell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employers Insurance Company of Wausau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Fidelity & Guaranty Company
Represented By: Kristopher T. Wilson
Represented By: Patricia Cowen Penton
Represented By: Katherine Osborne Hannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyds London
Represented By: James R Logan, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Bureau of Shipping
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Represented By: Edward J. Lassus, Jr.
Represented By: Richard J. Garvey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle, Inc.
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Janice M. Culotta
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: Douglas Watson Redfearn
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Represented By: April Ann McQuillar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Casualty & Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boland Marine and Manufacturing Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Insurance Company
Represented By: Renee F. Smith Auld
Represented By: Keith A. Kornman
Represented By: Julia Ann Dietz
Represented By: Sidney W. Degan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarty Corporation
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: Janice M. Culotta
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: Douglas Watson Redfearn
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Represented By: April Ann McQuillar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler LLC
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkshire Hathaway Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Marine Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sank, Inc.
Represented By: H. Philip Radecker, Jr.
Represented By: Shelley L. Thompson
Represented By: Lawrence G. Pugh, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer CropScience
Represented By: Milele N. St. Julien
Represented By: David M. Stein
Represented By: Ernest G. Foundas
Represented By: Francis Xavier deBlanc, III
Represented By: McGready Lewis Richeson
Represented By: Kathleen Erin Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bollinger Shipyards, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Brittney Bullock Ankersen
Represented By: Mathilde Villere Semmes
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Houston General Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boland Marine & Industrial, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity & Casualty Insurance Company of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Fire & Casualty Company
Represented By: Renee F. Smith Auld
Represented By: Keith A. Kornman
Represented By: Julia Ann Dietz
Represented By: Sidney W. Degan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurich American Insurance Company
Represented By: McNeil James Kemmerly
Represented By: Marc E. Devenport
Represented By: Lee M. LeBouef
Represented By: Edward T. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Brittney Bullock Ankersen
Represented By: Mathilde Villere Semmes
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland Casualty & Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trinity Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc
Represented By: Thomas A. Porteous
Represented By: Joseph Henry Hart, IV
Represented By: Daniel E. Oser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Main Iron Works LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Kristopher T. Wilson
Represented By: Patricia Cowen Penton
Represented By: Simeon B. Reimonenq, Jr.
Represented By: Katherine Osborne Hannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamorak Insurance Company
Represented By: Samuel Milton Rosamond, III
Represented By: Adam Devlin deMahy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swiftships Inc
Represented By: Nicholas F. LaRocca, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Malcolm McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swiftships, LLC
Represented By: Nicholas F. LaRocca, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bollinger Shipyards Lockport, LLC
Represented By: H. Philip Radecker, Jr.
Represented By: Shelley L. Thompson
Represented By: Lawrence G. Pugh, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company
Represented By: Simeon B. Reimonenq, Jr.
Represented By: Katherine Osborne Hannan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Chevron USA Inc
Represented By: Tim D. Gray
Represented By: Michael H. Abraham
Represented By: Chelsea Elizabeth Gaudin
Represented By: Margaret Whiteley McLaughlin
Represented By: McCann Elizabeth LeFeve
Represented By: Melissa Desormeaux Fuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Uniroyal, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Kassie Lee Richbourg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Manville Personal Injury Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas A. Porteous
Represented By: Joseph Henry Hart, IV
Represented By: Daniel E. Oser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Sank Inc
Represented By: H. Philip Radecker, Jr.
Represented By: Shelley L. Thompson
Represented By: Lawrence G. Pugh, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Tidewater Inc
Represented By: Destinee Finnin Ramos
Represented By: Alan Davis
Represented By: Delos E. Flint, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Hopeman Brothers Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Lloyd's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Hartford Accident & Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Fidelity and Casualty Insurance Company of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: Foster Wheeler, LLC
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Albert Bossier
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Alex Tyler Robertson
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Michael Kevin Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: Gustave A. Fritchie, III
Represented By: David Michael Melancon
Represented By: Timothy Farrow Daniels
Represented By: Alex Tyler Robertson
Represented By: Edward Winter Trapolin
Represented By: Michael Kevin Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Grant Gooding
Represented By: Scott R. Bickford
Represented By: Neil Franz Nazareth
Represented By: Michael E Lillis
Represented By: Spencer R. Doody
Represented By: Lawrence J. Centola, III
Represented By: Jason Zachary Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Leupold
Represented By: Scott R. Bickford
Represented By: Neil Franz Nazareth
Represented By: Michael E Lillis
Represented By: Spencer R. Doody
Represented By: Lawrence J. Centola, III
Represented By: Jason Zachary Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Gooding
Represented By: Scott R. Bickford
Represented By: Neil Franz Nazareth
Represented By: Michael E Lillis
Represented By: Spencer R. Doody
Represented By: Lawrence J. Centola, III
Represented By: Jason Zachary Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroline Pendergast
Represented By: Scott R. Bickford
Represented By: Neil Franz Nazareth
Represented By: Michael E Lillis
Represented By: Spencer R. Doody
Represented By: Lawrence J. Centola, III
Represented By: Jason Zachary Landry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?