Williams v. Louisiana State et al
Plaintiff: Latiasha Smith Williams
Defendant: Louisiana State, Unidentified Parties, John Crain, Robert Tanner, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Gary King, Brink Hillman, Dustin Rogers and James LeBlanc
Case Number: 2:2020cv01145
Filed: April 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
2 Judge: Janis van Meerveld
3 Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Filing 34 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #31 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. **Filing attorney should have linked filing to Document 25. Clerk properly linked document.** (mm)
June 2, 2020 Filing 33 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Gary King re #25 MOTION to Remand and Alternatively, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (Best, Jacob)
June 2, 2020 Filing 32 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by James LeBlanc, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Louisiana State, Robert Tanner re #25 MOTION to Remand and Alternatively, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (Krouse, Allen)
June 2, 2020 Filing 31 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by John Crain re #25 MOTION to Remand and Alternatively, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (Patin, Darren) Modified text/linkage on 6/3/2020 (mm).
June 1, 2020 Filing 30 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Dustin Rogers re #25 MOTION to Remand and Alternatively, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (Allgood, Davis)
May 29, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Brink Hillman re #25 MOTION to Remand and Alternatively, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. (Fahrenholt, Gregory)
May 15, 2020 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by James LeBlanc, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Louisiana State, Robert Tanner.(Krouse, Allen)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 MOTION to Continue Submission Date on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. The submission date for #25 MOTION to Remand and Alternatively, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment is continued to 6/10/2020. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 05/15/2020.(ko)
May 13, 2020 Filing 26 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Continue Submission Date on Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand and Alternatively, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment re: rec. doc. 25 by John Crain, Brink Hillman, Gary King, James LeBlanc, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Louisiana State, Dustin Rogers, Robert Tanner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Krouse, Allen) Modified text on 5/13/2020 (mm).
May 7, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Remand and Alternatively, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Latiasha Smith Williams. Motion(s) will be submitted on 5/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Notice of Submission)(Macaluso, Ron)
May 5, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER With Affirmative Defenses to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by John Crain.(Patin, Darren) Modified text on 5/6/2020 (mm).
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal: Defendants, State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Secretary James LeBlanc and Warden Robert Tanner, are hereby granted an extension up to and including 05/15/2020 to file responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's Petition for Damages. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 05/05/2020. (ko)
May 5, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Brink Hillman.(Phayer, Dennis)
May 5, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Gary King.(Best, Jacob)
May 4, 2020 Filing 20 EXPARTE/CONSENT Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings re #1 Notice of Removal by James LeBlanc, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Louisiana State, Robert Tanner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Krouse, Allen) Modified text on 5/5/2020 (mm).
May 4, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal by Dustin Rogers.(Allgood, Davis)
May 1, 2020 Filing 18 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings re #1 Notice of Removal by James LeBlanc, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Louisiana State, Robert Tanner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Krouse, Allen) Modified text on 5/4/2020 (mm).
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF RECUSAL - My son-in-law, T. Patrick O'Leary, is a partner of the Frilot, L.L.C. firm, which represents several defendants in this matter. Accordingly, I am required to recuse myself from this matter. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr on 4/23/2020. (NEF: Mag. 1) (sa)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle, Magistrate Judge Michael North no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 04/21/2020.(ko)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Plaintiff's petition for Damages as to Dustin Rogers answer due 5/5/2020. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 04/16/2020. (ko)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Plaintiff's Petition for Damages as to John Crain answer due 5/5/2020. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 04/16/2020. (ko)
April 13, 2020 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal,, by Dustin Rogers. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Allgood, Davis)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for defendant Brink Hillman to plead in response to plaintiff's petition for damages is 05/05/2020. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 04/13/2020. (ko)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal. The deadline for defendants State of Louisiana, Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Secretary James LeBlanc, and Warden Robert Tanner to file responsive pleadings to plaintiff's petition for damages is 5/5/2020. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 4/13/2020. (jls)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, Petition for Damages. The deadline for defendant Gary King to plead in response to plaintiff's petition for damages is 5/5/2020. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 4/13/2020.(jls)
April 13, 2020 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal by John Crain. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Patin, Darren)
April 9, 2020 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by James LeBlanc, Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections, Louisiana State, Robert Tanner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Krouse, Allen) Modified text on 4/13/2020 (jls).
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Middle; Case Number 3:20-cv-00212. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (mp)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order . Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 07/08/2019. (ELW) [Transferred from lamd on 4/9/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Transferring Case to the Eastern District of Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge Erin Wilder-Doomes on 04/08/2020. (ELW) [Transferred from lamd on 4/9/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, by Brink Hillman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Phayer, Dennis) [Transferred from lamd on 4/9/2020.]
April 8, 2020 Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Notice of Removal, Petition for Damages by Gary King. (Giambrone, Guice) [Transferred from lamd on 4/9/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 2 Letter to Attorney Guice A. Giambrone III regarding Jacob K. Best who is Co-Counsel for party Gary King. Attorney is not admitted to practice in LAMD. (LT) [Transferred from lamd on 4/9/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 19th Judicial District Court Parish of East Baton Rouge, Case Number C-694434. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2098609), filed by Robert Tanner, James LeBlanc, State of Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Krouse, Allen) [Transferred from lamd on 4/9/2020.] (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/9/2020: #5 List of All Parties and Attorneys) (mp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Louisiana State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana State
Represented By: Allen Joseph Krouse, III
Represented By: Suzanne Marie Risey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crain
Represented By: Darren Albert Patin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Tanner
Represented By: Allen Joseph Krouse, III
Represented By: Suzanne Marie Risey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Louisiana Department of Public Safety and Corrections
Represented By: Allen Joseph Krouse, III
Represented By: Suzanne Marie Risey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary King
Represented By: Guice Anthony Giambrone, III
Represented By: Jacob Kenneth Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brink Hillman
Represented By: Dennis J. Phayer
Represented By: Gregory C. Fahrenholt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Rogers
Represented By: Davis B. Allgood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James LeBlanc
Represented By: Allen Joseph Krouse, III
Represented By: Suzanne Marie Risey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latiasha Smith Williams
Represented By: Ron S. Macaluso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?