Malinowski v. James River Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Michael Malinowski and Michael T Malinowski
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01180
Filed: April 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/28/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Wendy B Vitter. All discovery must be completed by 11/16/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/14/2021 11:00 AM before Judge Wendy B Vitter. Jury Trial set for 2/1/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Wendy B Vitter. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on May 29, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(mp)
May 21, 2020 Filing 8 RE-NOTICE of Hearing. Due to a scheduling conflict- the call in scheduling conference has been reset for 5/28/2020 01:00 PM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. Please follow the instructions provided in the notice.(mmv)
May 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing. A call-in scheduling conference is set for 5/29/2020 at 10:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. Please follow the instructions provided in the notice.(mmv)
May 14, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Petition for Damages, with Jury Demand by James River Insurance Company.(Garrison, Travis) Modified text on 5/15/2020 (jeg).
April 28, 2020 Filing 5 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by James River Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent James River Group Holdings, Ltd., Corporate Parent James River Group, Inc. for James River Insurance Company (Garrison, Travis)
April 28, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Compliance by James River Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Pleadings)(Garrison, Travis) Modified text on 4/29/2020 (jeg).
April 14, 2020 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (pp)
April 13, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (aj)
April 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2020-00780 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8256534) filed by James River Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)Attorney Travis Lyon Garrison added to party James River Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Garrison, Travis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malinowski v. James River Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Malinowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael T Malinowski
Represented By: Michael Thomas Malinowski, Jr.
Represented By: Robert M. Lucky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James River Insurance Company
Represented By: Travis Lyon Garrison
Represented By: Lyon H. Garrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?