Guidry v. T & D Towing, LLC
Plaintiff: Dillion Guidry and Dillon Guidry
Defendant: T & D Towing, LLC and T&D Towing L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01209
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
2 Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: A STATUS CONFERENCE will be held BY TELEPHONE on WEDNESDAY, JULY 8, 2020 at 9:00 A.M. Counsel shall comply as instructed herein. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on June 11, 2020.(mp)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/8/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. All discovery must be completed by 10/19/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/3/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Jury Trial set for 1/11/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Signed by Case Manager. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(NEF: Mag. Judge)(mp)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown.(lag)
May 20, 2020 Filing 7 PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE NOTICE: A Preliminary Conference by Telephone is set for 6/11/2020 10:00 AM before the Case Manager. Call-in instructions provided herein. Signed by Case Manager. (mp)
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by T&D Towing L.L.C. (Willhoft, Jill)
May 19, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by T&D Towing L.L.C..Attorney Jill Schultz Willhoft added to party T&D Towing L.L.C.(pty:dft).(Willhoft, Jill)
April 28, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to T&D Towing L.L.C. on 4/27/2020, answer due 6/26/2020. (Harris, Tammy)
April 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to T & D Towing, LLC. (mp)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (aj)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 SEAMAN COMPLAINT with jury demand against T & D Towing, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8263409) filed by Dillion Guidry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Timothy J. Young added to party Dillion Guidry(pty:pla).(Young, Timothy) Modified on 4/17/2020 (mp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Guidry v. T & D Towing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dillion Guidry
Represented By: Timothy J. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dillon Guidry
Represented By: Megan C Misko
Represented By: Timothy J. Young
Represented By: Tammy D. Harris
Represented By: Joseph Benedict Marino, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T & D Towing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T&D Towing L.L.C.
Represented By: Alex S Aughtry
Represented By: Jill Schultz Willhoft
Represented By: William Bryon Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?