Marintez v. Crowley Marine Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gustavo Martinez
Defendant: Crowley Marine Services, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01210
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/6/2021 02:30 PM before Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Jury Trial set for 2/1/2021 09:30 AM before Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. All discovery must be completed by 11/23/2020. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry. Issued for the Court by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form) (NEF: Magistrate Judge)(ko)
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 6/11/2020 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(ko)
May 22, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Crowley Marine Services, Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 6/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Proposed Order) Attorney Alexandra Grace Roselli added to party Crowley Marine Services, Inc.(pty:dft).(Roselli, Alexandra)
April 27, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Crowley Marine Services, Inc. served on 4/22/2020, answer due 5/13/2020. (Young, Timothy)
April 21, 2020 Filing 4 FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL AND AMENDING PETITION with Jury Demand against Crowley Marine Services, Inc. filed by Gustavo Martinez.(Misko, Megan) Modified text on 4/21/2020 (mm).
April 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Crowley Marine Services, Inc. (mm)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (aj)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 SEAMAN COMPLAINT with jury demand against Crowley Marine Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8263419) filed by Gustavo Marintez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) Attorney Timothy J. Young added to party Gustavo Martinez(pty:pla).(Young, Timothy) Modified text on 4/17/2020 (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marintez v. Crowley Marine Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crowley Marine Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Martinez
Represented By: Timothy J. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?