Bisso Towboat Company, Inc. et al v. ACBL River Operations, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bisso Towboat Company, Inc.
Defendant: Dru Lirette, M/V, ACBL River Operations, LLC, ABC Insurance Company, Inland Marine Service, Inc. and AEP River Operations, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01263
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Referring Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: GRANTING #8 Motion to Dismiss Case. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 5/19/2020. (am)
May 18, 2020 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Dismiss Case by Bisso Towboat Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Harris, Rufus)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Stay Warrant of Arrest. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 4/27/2920. (am)(3cc: USM) Modified on 4/29/2020 (am).
April 24, 2020 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Stay Warrant of Arrest by Bisso Towboat Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martin, Cindy)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 WARRANT of Arrest of Vessel issued.(3cc: USM) (am)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 4/22/2020. (3cc: USM)(am)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (aj)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest in rem by Bisso Towboat Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martin, Cindy)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABC Insurance Company, ACBL River Operations, LLC, AEP River Operations, LLC, Inland Marine Service, Inc., M/V DRU LIRETTE (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8271258) filed by Bisso Towboat Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Cindy Galpin Martin added to party Bisso Towboat Company, Inc.(pty:pla).(Martin, Cindy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bisso Towboat Company, Inc. et al v. ACBL River Operations, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dru Lirette, M/V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACBL River Operations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inland Marine Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEP River Operations, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bisso Towboat Company, Inc.
Represented By: Alfred Jackson Rufty, III
Represented By: Rufus C. Harris, III
Represented By: Cindy Galpin Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?