Q Clothier New Orleans, LLC et al v. Twin City Fire Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Q Clothier Ft. Worth, LLC, Q Clothier Tulsa, LLC, Q Clothier New Orleans, LLC, Q Custom Clothier OKC, LLC, Q Custom Clothier Houston, LLC, Q Shirtmakers West Village, LLC, Q Custom Clothier ATL, LLC, Q Fifty One, LLC and Q Fifty One Digital, LLC
Defendant: Twin City Fire Insurance Company and Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01470
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
2 Judge: Joseph C Wilkinson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/18/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. Jury Trial set for 4/12/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. All discovery must be completed by 2/17/2021. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(kac)
July 9, 2020 Filing 19 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Q Clothier Ft. Worth, LLC, Q Clothier New Orleans, LLC, Q Clothier Tulsa, LLC, Q Custom Clothier Atl, LLC, Q Custom Clothier Houston, LLC, Q Custom Clothier OKC, LLC, Q Fifty One Digital, LLC, Q Fifty One, LLC, Q Shirtmakers West Village, LLC (Schexnaydre, David)
July 8, 2020 Filing 18 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Twin City Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Fire Insurance Company for Twin City Fire Insurance Company (Babb, Nicole)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Frank Winston, Jr. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 7/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (cwa)
July 7, 2020 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alexandra R. Galdos (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8390996) by Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Alexandra R. Galdos, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Babb, Nicole)
July 7, 2020 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Sarah D. Gordon (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8390969) by Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Sarah D. Gordon, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Babb, Nicole)
July 6, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Twin City Fire Insurance Company.(Babb, Nicole) Modified on 7/7/2020 (pp).
July 6, 2020 Filing 13 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8388712) by Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Frank Winston, Jr., #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Consent to Electronic Filing, #4 Proposed Order)(Babb, Nicole)
June 29, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 7/10/2020 09:45 AM before case manager by telephone. All parties are to call into the conference call at the number listed in the notice. By Clerk. (kac)
June 22, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to Hartford Fire Insurance Company by All Plaintiffs. (Schexnaydre, David)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 , #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Hartford Fire Insurance Company answer due 7/3/2020; Twin City Fire Insurance Company answer due 7/3/2020. Signed by Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle on 06/12/2020. (ko)
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Nicole M. Babb added to party Twin City Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Babb, Nicole) Modified on 6/11/2020 (pp).
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint by Hartford Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Nicole M. Babb added to party Hartford Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Babb, Nicole) Modified on 6/11/2020 (pp).
June 3, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Twin City Fire Insurance Company served on 5/22/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. (Schexnaydre, David)
June 3, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Hartford Fire Insurance Company served on 5/22/2020, answer due 6/12/2020. (Schexnaydre, David)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown.(lag)
May 19, 2020 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint.**1. Attachment has duplicate description. For attachment, select either a category OR enter a description, but not both since this results in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. 2. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Summons. The pdf should not have the purple boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. No further action necessary.** (pp)
May 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hartford Fire Insurance Company, Twin City Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(pp)
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Wilkinson, Jr. (aj)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8307661) filed by Q Clothier Tulsa, LLC, Q Custom Clothier Houston, LLC, Q Clothier Ft. Worth, LLC, Q Fifty One, LLC, Q Shirtmakers West Village, LLC, Q Fifty One Digital, LLC, Q Clothier New Orleans, LLC, Q Custom Clothier OKC, LLC, Q Custom Clothier ATL, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons , #3 Summons)Attorney David J. Schexnaydre added to party Q Clothier Ft. Worth, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney David J. Schexnaydre added to party Q Clothier New Orleans, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney David J. Schexnaydre added to party Q Clothier Tulsa, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney David J. Schexnaydre added to party Q Custom Clothier ATL, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney David J. Schexnaydre added to party Q Custom Clothier Houston, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney David J. Schexnaydre added to party Q Custom Clothier OKC, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney David J. Schexnaydre added to party Q Fifty One Digital, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney David J. Schexnaydre added to party Q Fifty One, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney David J. Schexnaydre added to party Q Shirtmakers West Village, LLC(pty:pla).(Schexnaydre, David) (Attachment 2 replaced on 5/19/2020) (pp). (Attachment 3 replaced on 5/19/2020) (pp). Modified text on 5/19/2020 (pp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Q Clothier New Orleans, LLC et al v. Twin City Fire Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Q Clothier Ft. Worth, LLC
Represented By: David J. Schexnaydre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Q Clothier Tulsa, LLC
Represented By: David J. Schexnaydre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Q Clothier New Orleans, LLC
Represented By: David J. Schexnaydre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Q Custom Clothier OKC, LLC
Represented By: David J. Schexnaydre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Q Custom Clothier Houston, LLC
Represented By: David J. Schexnaydre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Q Shirtmakers West Village, LLC
Represented By: David J. Schexnaydre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Q Custom Clothier ATL, LLC
Represented By: David J. Schexnaydre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Q Fifty One, LLC
Represented By: David J. Schexnaydre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Q Fifty One Digital, LLC
Represented By: David J. Schexnaydre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Twin City Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Seth Andrew Schmeeckle
Represented By: Nicole M. Babb
Represented By: Frank Winston, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Seth Andrew Schmeeckle
Represented By: Nicole M. Babb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?