Ohio Security Insurance Company et al v. Legion Claims Solutions, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Ohio Security Insurance Company, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company and Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Legion Claims Solution, L.L.C. and Legion Claims Solutions, L.L.C.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01474
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Consent Judgment and Rule 41(a) Stipulation of Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Giarrusso, Catherine)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff's counsel shall have up to and including JULY 27, 2020 to further prosecute their claim(s) or obtain responsive pleadings from the defendant Legion Claims Solutions, L.L.C. Failure to comply with this Order of the Court or, show good cause in writing as to why this matter should not be dismissed, will result in dismissal of the above captioned case in its entirety. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on July 6, 2020.(mp)
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Summons Returned Executed. Filing attorney selected incorrect party as to which party the summons was issued to. Clerk modified the text to indicate that Legion Claims Solutions, L.L.C. was the party served. No further action is necessary. (mp)
May 28, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Legion Claims Solutions, L.L.C. served on 5/19/2020, answer due 6/9/2020. (Giarrusso, Catherine) Modified text on 5/29/2020 (mp).
May 19, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Legion Claims Solution, L.L.C.. (mp)
May 19, 2020 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney immediately notified the clerk that Exhibit A was omitted from the original filing. Exhibit A was subsequently received and attached to the Complaint by clerk. (mp)
May 19, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Lance M Africk and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Legion Claims Solution, L.L.C. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8308149) filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney H. Minor Pipes, III added to party Ohio Security Insurance Company(pty:pla), Attorney H. Minor Pipes, III added to party The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company(pty:pla).(Pipes, H.) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/19/2020: #3 Exhibit A) (mp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohio Security Insurance Company et al v. Legion Claims Solutions, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legion Claims Solution, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legion Claims Solutions, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Represented By: H. Minor Pipes, III
Represented By: Catherine Fornias Giarrusso
Represented By: Susan Muller Rogge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: H. Minor Pipes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Catherine Fornias Giarrusso
Represented By: Susan Muller Rogge
Represented By: H. Minor Pipes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?