Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation v. Iztaccihuatl 2501
Plaintiff: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation
Defendant: Iztaccihuatl 2501
Petitioner: Barcazas y Remolques, S.A. de C.V.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01521
Filed: May 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Lance M Africk
Referring Judge: Dana Douglas
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46 U.S.C. ยง 31325
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Filing 50 NOTICE of Proces Verbal by USM regarding sale of barge on 2/25/2021. (cwa)
December 31, 2020 Filing 49 JUDGMENT entered in favor of Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation against Iztaccihuatl 2501. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 12/31/2020. (cc: USM)(blg)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #31 Motion for final order of sale of the Vessel. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 12/31/2020. (cc: USM) (blg)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER AND REASONS granting #30 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 12/31/2020. (blg)
December 29, 2020 Filing 46 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lance M Africk: Telephone Status Conference held on 12/29/2020. (blg)
December 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER denying #40 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 12/16/2020. (blg)
December 16, 2020 Filing 44 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lance M Africk: Final Pretrial Conference held on 12/16/2020. (blg)
December 15, 2020 Filing 43 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation re #40 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment . (McNeil, Adam)
December 14, 2020 Filing 42 Joint Proposed Pretrial Order by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation, Barcazas y Remolques, S.A. de C.V., Iztaccihuatl 2501 (McNeil, Adam) Modified text/filers on 12/14/2020 (cwa).
December 14, 2020 Filing 41 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #40 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment. Document does not contain Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate (3). Additionally, attachment was imaged as 8-1/2" x 14". All documents should be 8-1/2" x 11". Clerk has corrected the image. (cwa)
December 11, 2020 Filing 40 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Memorandum in Support of Its Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Barcazas y Remolques, S.A. de C.V. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading, #3 Exhibit A)(Strickland, Timothy) (Attachment 3 replaced on 12/14/2020) (cwa). Modified text on 12/14/2020 (cwa).
November 17, 2020 Filing 39 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation re #31 MOTION For Interlocutory Sale of Vessel and Authority to Credit Bid. (mp)
November 17, 2020 Filing 38 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation re #30 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (mp)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #34 and #35 Motions for Leave to File Reply are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on November 17, 2020. (mp)
November 17, 2020 Filing 36 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Barcazas y Remolques, S.A. de C.V. re #30 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A_1st Amd to Loan Agreement, #2 Exhibit ExB_2nd Promissory Note, #3 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts Statement of Material Facts in Dispute)(Strickland, Timothy)
November 16, 2020 Filing 35 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion for Interlocutory Sale of Vessel and Authority to Credit Bid by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(McNeil, Adam)
November 16, 2020 Filing 34 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment and for Enforcement of First Preferred Ship Mortgage by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(McNeil, Adam)
November 10, 2020 Filing 33 DEFICIENT: RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Barcazas y Remolques, S.A. de C.V. re #30 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ExA_BYR_1st Amd Loan Agreement, #2 Exhibit ExB_BYR_2nd Promissory Note, #3 Proposed Order Prop Order Denying Vessel Sale)(Strickland, Timothy) Modified on 11/10/2020 (mp).
November 10, 2020 Filing 32 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Barcazas y Remolques, S.A. de C.V. re #31 MOTION For Interlocutory Sale of Vessel and Authority to Credit Bid . (Strickland, Timothy)
October 22, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION For Interlocutory Sale of Vessel and Authority to Credit Bid by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)(McNeil, Adam)
October 22, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. Motion(s) will be submitted on 11/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 1A, #4 Exhibit 1B, #5 Exhibit 1C, #6 Exhibit 1D, #7 Exhibit 1E, #8 Exhibit 1F, #9 Exhibit 1G, #10 Exhibit 2, #11 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #12 Notice of Submission)(McNeil, Adam)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Lance M Africk: Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/20/2020. IT IS ORDERED that Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation may file both a timely motion for summary judgment and a timely motion to sell the vessel. Signed by Judge Lance M. Africk. (mp)
October 16, 2020 Filing 28 Witness and Exhibit List by All Defendants. (Strickland, Timothy)
October 16, 2020 Filing 27 Witness and Exhibit List by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (McNeil, Adam)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: A status conference will be held BY TELEPHONE with respect to the filing of a motion for summary judgment in the above-captioned case on Tuesday, October 20, 2020 at 9:30 A.M. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on October 9, 2020.(mp)
September 25, 2020 Filing 25 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas: Settlement Conference held on 9/25/2020. A settlement could not be confected at this time. Counsel are instructed to notify the undersigned if an additional settlement conference would be beneficial prior to trial. (cg)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - A settlement conference in the above captioned matter is hereby SCHEDULED for Friday, September 25, 2020 at 10:00 A.M. before United States Magistrate Judge Dana M. Douglas. Each party shall provide, in confidence, a concise settlement memorandum. The memorandum shall be submitted three (3) working days prior to the conference and shall be no longer than three (3) pages double spaced. The memorandum shall be emailed directly to: efile-douglas@laed.uscourts.gov. The email subject line should read: "Settlement Position Paper for [case number] on [date of conference]". Signed by Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas on 8/26/20.(cg)
August 26, 2020 Filing 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lance M Africk: Status Conference held on 8/26/2020. The previously scheduled pretrial and trial dates remain in effect. A settlement conference has been scheduled with U.S. Magistrate Judge Dana M. Douglas on September 18, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. (mp)
August 20, 2020 Filing 22 STATUS REPORT by Barcazas y Remolques, S.A. de C.V., Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation (McNeil, Adam)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - A STATUS CONFERENCE will be held BY TELEPHONE on WEDNESDAY, AUGUST 26, 2020 at 9:30 A.M. COUNSEL SHALL FURNISH THE COURT WITH THE NAME AND TELEPHONE NUMBER OF WHO WILL PARTICIPATE IN THE CONFERENCE TWO DAYS PRIOR TO THE CONFERENCE AS STATED HEREIN. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on 7/29/20.(cg)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER:Status Conference set for 8/26/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. All discovery must be completed by 11/2/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/16/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Bench Trial set for 1/19/2021 08:30 AM before Judge Lance M Africk. Signed by Case Manger. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(NEF: Mag. Judge)(mp)
July 27, 2020 Filing 19 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Barcazas y Remolques, S.A. de C.V. (Strickland, Timothy)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Stacey Norstrud and #17 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Timothy W. Strickland. Signed by Judge Lance M Africk on July 21, 2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Visiting Attorneys) (mp)
July 20, 2020 Filing 17 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Timothy Strickland (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8409466) by Barcazas y Remolques, S.A. de C.V.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex1-Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Ex 2-Affidavit of Timothy Strickland, #3 Exhibit Ex 3-Consent to E-Filing form, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion PHV)(McAlpine, Michael)
July 20, 2020 Filing 16 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Stacey Norstrud (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8409275) by Barcazas y Remolques, S.A. de C.V.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Consent to E-Filing form, #4 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion PHV)(McAlpine, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 15 PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE ORDER: A Preliminary Conference by Telephone is set for 7/28/2020 09:30 AM before the Case Manager. Call-in instructions provided herein. Signed by Case Manager. (mp)
July 17, 2020 Filing 14 Original ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Barcazas y Remolques, S.A. de C.V..(McAlpine, Michael) Modified text on 7/20/2020 (mp).
June 26, 2020 Filing 13 Verification Statement of Right or Interest by Barcazas y Remolques, S.A. de C.V. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(McAlpine, Michael) (Attachment 1 resized & replaced on 6/29/2020) (mp). Modified on 7/1/2020 (caa).
June 25, 2020 Filing 12 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Caterpillar Inc for Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation (McNeil, Adam)
June 22, 2020 Filing 11 WARRANT Returned Executed as to Iztaccihuatl 2501 on 6/12/20. (mp)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Jane Triche Milazzo recused. Case reassigned to Judge Lance M Africk. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 5/28/2020. (NEF: Section I)(am)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: GRANTING #4 Motion to Appoint/Substitute Custodian, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 5/27/2020. (3cc: USM) (am)
May 27, 2020 Filing 8 WARRANT of Arrest of Vessel in rem issued. (3cc: USM) (am)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: GRANTING #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem, as set forth in document.. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 5/27/2020. (3cc: USM) (am)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Susie Morgan recused. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 5/26/2020.(sbs) (NEF: Section H)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Susie Morgan and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (go)
May 25, 2020 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appoint Custodian and Move Vessel by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(McNeil, Adam) Modified text on 5/26/2020 (sbs).
May 25, 2020 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Issuance of Warrant of Arrest in rem by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Warrant of Vessel Arrest)(McNeil, Adam) Modified text on 5/26/2020 (sbs). (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/26/2020) (ecm).
May 25, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Submitted for Issuance (McNeil, Adam)
May 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Iztaccihuatl 2501 (Filing fee $400 receipt number ALAEDC-8316681) filed by Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 3A, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Adam C. McNeil added to party Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation(pty:pla).(McNeil, Adam) (Attachments 1-3 replaced on 5/26/2020) (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation v. Iztaccihuatl 2501
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caterpillar Financial Services Corporation
Represented By: Adam C. McNeil
Represented By: Benjamin O. Schupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iztaccihuatl 2501
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Barcazas y Remolques, S.A. de C.V.
Represented By: Michael L. McAlpine
Represented By: Stacey Norstrud
Represented By: Timothy W. Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?