Swiftships, LLC, et al v. SBN V FNBC LLC, et al
Plaintiff: ICS Nett, Limited, ICS Nett, Inc., Jeffrey LeFleux, Shah Shah, Swiftships Shipbuilders, L.L.C., Swift Group, LLC, Swiftships, LLC, BOT, LLC, Swiftships Group, Inc., Khurram Shah and Calvin Lefleux
Defendant: SBN V FNBC LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01587
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion to Deposit Funds. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants are hereby granted leave to deposit the proceeds from the wire transfers described in the Motion into the registry of the Court, as set forth in document. FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' rights to request that all or part of the funds deposited pursuant to this Order be disbursed to the Defendants in connection with the resolution of the captioned matter are hereby reserved. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 07/20/2020. (ko)
July 17, 2020 Filing 36 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Deposit Funds in the Registry of the Court by SBN V FNBC LLC, Summit Investment Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Proposed Order)(Chaney, Mark)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Settlement Conference set for 8/6/2020 02:00 PM before Chief Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. All lead counsel are ordered to APPEAR BY VIDEO. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby.(mp)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #23 Motion to Expedite Discovery is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE subject to being refiled after the settlement conference scheduled before the undersigned United States Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (mp)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #29 JOINT MOTION to Continue Submission Date. The submission date for #25 MOTION for Hearing on Preliminary Injunction is continued to 9/2/2020. FURTHER ORDERED that this motion is without prejudice to Plaintiff's or Defendants who expressly reserve all of their respective rights, claims, and denses, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 07/02/2020.(ko)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #3 Amended Complaint, as to SBN V FNBC LLC, Summit Investment Management, LLC answer due 8/5/2020. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 07/02/2020. (ko)
July 2, 2020 Filing 31 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #3 Amended Complaint, by SBN V FNBC LLC, Summit Investment Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Chaney, Mark)
July 1, 2020 Filing 30 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #29 JOINT MOTION to Continue Submission Date. **1. Filing attorney did not enter additional filer(s) in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer(s). 2. Filing attorney incorrectly selected Calvin Lefleux as a filer(s). Only parties named in the body of the filing should be selected as filers. Clerk took corrective action.** (mm)
June 30, 2020 Filing 29 EXPARTE/CONSENT JOINT MOTION to Continue Submission Date re: rec. docs. 23 & 25 by BOT, LLC, ICS Nett, Inc., ICS Nett, Limited, Jeffrey Leleux, Khurram Shah, Shehraze Shah, Swift Group, LLC, Swiftships Group, Inc., Swiftships Shipbuilders, L.L.C., Swiftships, LLC, SBN V FNBC LLC, Summit Investment Managment, LLc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LaRocca, Nicholas) Modified filers/text on 7/1/2020 (mm).
June 30, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by SBN V FNBC LLC, Summit Investment Management, LLC re #23 MOTION to Expedite Discovery. (Chaney, Mark)
June 30, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by SBN V FNBC LLC, Summit Investment Management, LLC re #25 MOTION for Hearing on Preliminary Injunction. (Chaney, Mark)
June 19, 2020 Filing 26 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by All Plaintiffs regarding #25 MOTION for Hearing on Preliminary Injunction (Peck, Stewart)
June 19, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Hearing on Preliminary Injunction by BOT, LLC, ICS Nett, Inc., ICS Nett, Limited, Calvin Lefleux, Jeffrey Leleux, Khurram Shah, Shehraze Shah, Swift Group, LLC, Swiftships Group, Inc., Swiftships Shipbuilders, L.L.C., Swiftships, LLC Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)(Peck, Stewart)
June 19, 2020 Filing 24 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by All Plaintiffs regarding #23 MOTION to Expedite Discovery (Peck, Stewart)
June 19, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by BOT, LLC, ICS Nett, Inc., ICS Nett, Limited, Calvin Lefleux, Jeffrey Leleux, Khurram Shah, Shehraze Shah, Swift Group, LLC, Swiftships Group, Inc., Swiftships Shipbuilders, L.L.C., Swiftships, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Certification, #3 Document Requests, #4 Notice of Submission)(Peck, Stewart)
June 17, 2020 Filing 22 DEFICIENT: MOTION for Hearing on Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Request for Oral Argument)(Peck, Stewart) Modified text on 6/18/2020 (mm).
June 17, 2020 Filing 21 DEFICIENT: MOTION for Expedited Discovery by All Plaintiffs. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Request for Oral Argument)(Peck, Stewart) Modified text on 6/18/2020 (mm).
June 17, 2020 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to SBN V FNBC LLC, Summit Investment Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(mm)
June 17, 2020 Filing 19 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #15 Request for Summons Issued, #16 Request for Summons Issued. **These are duplicate filings of documents 17 and 18 and will be noted as such. No further action is necessary.** (mm)
June 17, 2020 Filing 18 Request of Summons Issued as to Summit Investment Management, LLC filed by Swiftships Group, Inc., Swiftships, LLC, Swiftships Shipbuilders, L.L.C. re #3 Amended Complaint. (Peck, Stewart)
June 17, 2020 Filing 17 Request of Summons Issued as to SBN V FNBC LLC filed by Swiftships Group, Inc., Swiftships, LLC, Swiftships Shipbuilders, L.L.C. re #3 Amended Complaint. (Peck, Stewart)
June 17, 2020 Filing 16 **DUPLICATE FILING OF DOCUMENT 18** Request of Summons Issued as to Summit Investment Management, LLC filed by All Plaintiffs re #3 Amended Complaint. (Peck, Stewart) Modified text on 6/17/2020 (mm).
June 17, 2020 Filing 15 **DUPLICATE FILING OF DOCUMENT 17** Request of Summons Issued as to SBN V FNBC LLC filed by All Plaintiffs re #3 Amended Complaint. (Peck, Stewart) Modified text on 6/17/2020 (mm).
June 17, 2020 Filing 14 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #12 Request for Summons Issued. **This is a duplicate filing of document 13 and will be noted as such. No further action is necessary.** (mm)
June 16, 2020 Filing 13 DEFICIENT: Request of Summons Issued as to SBN V FNBC LLC filed by Swiftships Group, Inc., Swiftships, LLC, Swiftships Shipbuilders, L.L.C. re #3 Amended Complaint. (Thurman, James) Modified text on 6/17/2020 (mm).
June 16, 2020 Filing 12 DUPLICATE FILING OF REC. DOC. 13- Request of Summons Issued as to Summit Investment Management, LLC filed by Swiftships Group, Inc., Swiftships, LLC, Swiftships Shipbuilders, L.L.C. re #3 Amended Complaint. (Thurman, James) Modified text on 6/17/2020 (mm).
June 10, 2020 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #8 Summons Returned Executed, #9 Summons Returned Executed. **The pages were filed out of order. Page 1 of the AO 440 should have been the first page and page 2 should have been the second page. Clerk took corrective action. No further action is needed.** (mm)
June 9, 2020 Filing 10 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Discovery on an Expedited Basis and Request for Show Cause Hearing on Preliminary Injunction by BOT, LLC, ICS Nett, Inc., ICS Nett, Limited, Calvin Lefleux, Jeffrey Leleux, Khurram Shah, Shehraze Shah, Swift Group, LLC, Swiftships Group, Inc., Swiftships Shipbuilders, L.L.C., Swiftships, LLC. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Document Requests, #2 Exhibit Proof of Delivery, #3 Proposed Order)(Peck, Stewart) Modified on text 6/10/2020 (mm).
June 9, 2020 Filing 9 DEFICIENT: SUMMONS Returned Executed; SBN Investment Management, LLC served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020. (Thurman, James) (Main Document 9 replaced on 6/10/2020) (mm). Modified text on 6/17/2020 (mm).
June 9, 2020 Filing 8 DEFICIENT: SUMMONS Returned Executed; SBN V FNBC LLC served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020. (Thurman, James) (Main Document 8 replaced on 6/10/2020) (mm). Modified text on 6/17/2020 (mm).
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 Request for Summons Issued. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the summons. The pdf should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (mm)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to SBN V FNBC LLC, Summit Investment Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(mm)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #3 Amended Complaint. **Filing attorney did not select Swiftships Shipbuilders, L.L.C., Swiftships, LLC, Swift Group, LLC, Swiftships Group, Inc., Shehraze Shah as filers. Clerk added filers.** (mm)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to Summit Investment Management, LLC, SBN V FNBC LLC filed by All Plaintiffs re #3 Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Peck, Stewart) Modified text on 6/5/2020 (mm). (Main Document 4 replaced on 6/5/2020) (mm). (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/5/2020) (mm).
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment and Injunctive Relief against SBN Investment Management, LLC, SBN V FNBC LLC filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Peck, Stewart) Modified filers on 6/5/2020 (mm).
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (aj)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8327973) filed by Swiftships, LLC, Swiftships Group, Inc., Calvin Lefleux, ICS Nett, Inc., BOT, LLC, Khurram Shah, Shehraze Shah, ICS Nett, Limited, Jeffrey Leleux, Swift Group, LLC, Swiftships Shipbuilders, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Verification) Attorney Stewart Foster Peck added to party BOT, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Stewart Foster Peck added to party ICS Nett, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Stewart Foster Peck added to party ICS Nett, Limited (pty:pla), Attorney Stewart Foster Peck added to party Jeffrey Leleux(pty:pla), Attorney Stewart Foster Peck added to party Calvin Lefleux(pty:pla), Attorney Stewart Foster Peck added to party Khurram Shah(pty:pla), Attorney Stewart Foster Peck added to party Shehraze Shah(pty:pla), Attorney Stewart Foster Peck added to party Swift Group, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Stewart Foster Peck added to party Swiftships Group, Inc.(pty:pla).(Peck, Stewart) Modified text on 6/3/2020 (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swiftships, LLC, et al v. SBN V FNBC LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ICS Nett, Limited
Represented By: Stewart Foster Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ICS Nett, Inc.
Represented By: Stewart Foster Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey LeFleux
Represented By: Stewart Foster Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shah Shah
Represented By: Stewart Foster Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swiftships Shipbuilders, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swift Group, LLC
Represented By: Stewart Foster Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swiftships, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOT, LLC
Represented By: Stewart Foster Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swiftships Group, Inc.
Represented By: Stewart Foster Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khurram Shah
Represented By: Stewart Foster Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Lefleux
Represented By: Stewart Foster Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SBN V FNBC LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?