Stein v. Golden
Plaintiff: Jonathan Stein
Defendant: Gretta Golden
Case Number: 2:2020cv01593
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice is hereby GRANTED. John K. Rubiner is admitted pro hac vice in connection with the above-referenced litigation and is enrolled as additional counsel for plaintiff herein with all privileges and rights pertaining thereto. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 6/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 PHV Notice) (jeg)
June 17, 2020 Filing 5 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice John K. Rubiner (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8361050) by Jonathan Stein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Declaration, #2 Exhibit B, Consent to Electronic Filing, #3 Exhibit C, Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order)(Bollinger, Brett) Modified text on 6/18/2020 (jeg).
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 **DEFICIENT** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ALAEDC-8351842) by Jonathan Stein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Declaration, #2 Exhibit B, Consent to Electronic Filing, #3 Exhibit C, Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order)(Bollinger, Brett) Modified on 6/15/2020 (jeg).
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Gretta Golden. (pp)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (aj)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Gretta Golden (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8331619) filed by Jonathan Stein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)Attorney Brett M. Bollinger added to party Jonathan Stein(pty:pla).(Bollinger, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stein v. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gretta Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Stein
Represented By: Brett M. Bollinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?