LNV Corporation v. Desai et al
Plaintiff: LNV Corporation
Defendant: Nipun Desai and Pravinchandra Desai
Case Number: 2:2020cv01594
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Jane Triche Milazzo
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 18 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite [Ex Parte Motion for Expedited Consideration of Motion to Reset Submission Date (related to R. Doc. 17)] by LNV Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Janke, Benjamin)
July 31, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION to Continue [Motion to Reset Submission Date (related to R. Doc. 11 and R. Doc. 12)] by LNV Corporation. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Notice of Submission, #4 Proposed Order)(Janke, Benjamin)
July 29, 2020 Filing 16 **DEFICIENT**EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Reset Submission Date (related to R. Doc. 11 and Rec. Doc. 12)] by LNV Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Janke, Benjamin) Modified text/removed referral on 7/30/2020 (am). Modified on 7/30/2020 (am).
July 27, 2020 Filing 15 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #12 MOTION for Hearing re #11 MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process with Oral Testimony, #11 MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process.**Please, disregard the previously issued correction regarding referral of motions. The motions will be submitted before the District Judge.** (am)
July 27, 2020 Filing 14 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #12 MOTION for Hearing re #11 MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process with Oral Testimony. **1. Filing attorney should have changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the Magistrate Judge. Clerk took corrective action. **2. Filing attorney should have selected 'Yes' at the question 'Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?'. Exparte/Consent Motions are not set for submission. Clerk modified docket text to reflect 'Exparte' and removed submission date.** (am)
July 27, 2020 Filing 13 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process. **Filing attorney should have changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the Magistrate Judge. Clerk took corrective action.** (am)
July 26, 2020 Filing 12 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Hearing re #11 MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process with Oral Testimony by Pravinchandra Desai. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Proposed Order)(Venezia, John) Modified text/removed submission date on 7/27/2020 (am). Modified on 7/27/2020 (am).
July 26, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Quash Purported Service of Process by Pravinchandra Desai. M Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit, #4 Notice of Submission, #5 Proposed Order)Attorney John A. Venezia added to party Pravinchandra Desai(pty:dft).(Venezia, John) Modified text on 7/27/2020 (am). Modified on 7/27/2020 (am).
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Pravinchandra Desai served on 7/4/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Mentz, Margaret)
July 13, 2020 Filing 9 **DEFICIENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed; Pravinchandra Desai served on 7/5/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Mentz, Margaret) Modified on 7/14/2020 (cwa).
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 ENTRY OF DEFAULT granting #6 Motion for Entry of Default as to Nipun Desai. Signed by clerk. (Attachments: #1 Address Sheet) (Copy mailed to defendant at both addresses) (ecm)
July 1, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Pravinchandra Desai. (am)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Entry of Default as to Nipun Desai a/k/a Nick Desai by LNV Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1" Affidavit, #2 Entry of Default)(Janke, Benjamin)
June 29, 2020 Filing 5 Request of Summons Issued as to Pravinchandra Desai filed by LNV Corporation re #1 Complaint,,. (Mentz, Margaret)
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Nipun Desai served on 6/7/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. (Mentz, Margaret) Modified text on 6/18/2020 (am).
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Nipun Desai. (am)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go)
June 3, 2020 Filing fee received from LNV Corporation: Receipt no. ALAEDC-8331940 $ 400.00 (go)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nipun Desai, Pravinchandra Desai (Fee previously paid) filed by LNV Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Summons)Attorney Benjamin W. Janke added to party LNV Corporation(pty:pla).(Janke, Benjamin) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/3/2020: #13 Summons) (ecm). (Attachment 11 replaced on 6/4/2020) (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LNV Corporation v. Desai et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nipun Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pravinchandra Desai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LNV Corporation
Represented By: Benjamin W. Janke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?