Zuppardo v. General Motors, LLC
Plaintiff: Joseph Zuppardo
Defendant: General Motors, LLC and General Motors LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01596
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Wendy B Vitter
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing. A call-in scheduling conference is set for 8/3/2020 11:30 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk. Please follow the instructions provided in the notice.(mmv)
July 6, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by General Motors LLC.(Cassisa, Margaret)
June 29, 2020 Filing 12 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by General Motors LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Company, Corporate Parent General Motors Holdings LLC for General Motors LLC (Cassisa, Margaret)
June 29, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by General Motors LLC.Attorney Margaret A. Cassisa added to party General Motors LLC(pty:dft).(Cassisa, Margaret)
June 12, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against General Motors LLC filed by Joseph Zuppardo.(Dalton, Richard)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Amended Complaint (R. Doc. 8) be STRICKEN from the record for failure to comply with the Court's June 5, 2020 Order (R. Doc. 4), and the Court's June 10, 2020 Order (R. Doc. 7). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff, Joseph Zuppardo, shall have seven (7) days from the date of this Order to file a comprehensive amended Complaint, without further leave of Court, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 6/11/2020.(jeg)
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 **STRICKEN per Order rec doc 9** AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against General Motors LLC filed by Joseph Zuppardo.(Dalton, Richard) Modified text on 6/11/2020 (jeg). Modified on 6/12/2020 (jeg).
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Amended Complaint (R. Doc. 5) be STRICKEN from the record for failure to comply with the Courts June 5, 2020 Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff, Joseph Zuppardo, shall have seven (7) days from the date of this Order to file a comprehensive amended Complaint, without further leave of Court, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 6/10/2020.(jeg)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Amended Complaint. **Document does not contain Section and Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section D Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate 3 Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. No further action necessary.** (jeg)
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 **STRICKEN per Order rec doc 7** AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against General Motors LLC filed by Joseph Zuppardo.(Dalton, Richard) Modified on 6/10/2020 (jeg).
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff, Joseph Zuppardo, shall have seven (7) days from the date of this Order to file a comprehensive amended Complaint, without further leave of Court, as set forth in document. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 6/5/2020.(jeg)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to General Motors, LLC. (jeg)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (go)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against General Motors, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8332103) filed by Joseph Zuppardo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Richard Collins Dalton added to party Joseph Zuppardo(pty:pla).(Dalton, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zuppardo v. General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors LLC
Represented By: Margaret A. Cassisa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Zuppardo
Represented By: Richard Collins Dalton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?