Nguyen v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Paul Nguyen
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01609
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 00:0000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company on 6/9/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Toledano, Reagan)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020. (Toledano, Reagan)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (cg)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8333480) filed by Paul Nguyen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Reagan Levert Toledano added to party Paul Nguyen(pty:pla).(Toledano, Reagan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Nguyen
Represented By: Reagan Levert Toledano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?