Robertson v. Smith
Plaintiff: Demetrius Deshawn Robertson
Defendant: Randy Smith
Case Number: 2:2020cv01614
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: IT IS RECOMMENDED that #1 Complaint filed by Demetrius Deshawn Robertson be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as frivolous and/or for failing to state a claim on which relief may be granted. Objections to R&R due by 7/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 6/16/2020.(ajn)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PAUPER ORDER Granting Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with a partial payment of $0.00 and directing the remainder of filing fee be made from Prisoner Account as to Demetrius Deshawn Robertson in monthly payments as set out in document. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is DIRECTED to withhold issuanc of summons until further order of the Court.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 6/5/20.(cg)(cc: Sheriff)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Demetrius Deshawn Robertson. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (mm)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Randy Smith filed by Demetrius Deshawn Robertson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demetrius Deshawn Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?