XL Specialty Insurance Co.,et al v. Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Penobscot Bay Tractor Tug Co., XL Specialty Insurance Co.. and XL Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: CAILLOU ISLAND TOWING CO. INC., Virgie Cenac M/V and Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc.
In Re: Tugboat VIRGIE CENAC
Case Number: 2:2020cv01663
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Dana Douglas
Referring Judge: Ivan LR Lemelle
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing. Scheduling Conference set for 8/14/2020 10:15 AM before case manager by telephone. All parties are to call into the conference call at the number listed in the notice. By Clerk. (kac)
July 28, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint by Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc..Attorney Miles C. Thomas added to party Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc.(pty:dft).(Thomas, Miles)
July 7, 2020 Filing 5 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc., Virgie Cenac M/V filed by Penobscot Bay Tractor Tug Co..(Barnett, Gregory)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc. (pp)
June 10, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Dana Douglas. (cc)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by XL Specialty Insurance Co.. identifying Corporate Parent AXA SA for XL Specialty Insurance Co.. (Barnett, Gregory)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CAILLOU ISLAND TOWING CO. INC., Tugboat VIRGIE CENAC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8346576) filed by XL Specialty Insurance Co.., Penobscot Bay Tractor Tug Co.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Gregory George Barnett added to party Penobscot Bay Tractor Tug Co.(pty:pla), Attorney Gregory George Barnett added to party XL Specialty Insurance Co.. (pty:pla).(Barnett, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: XL Specialty Insurance Co.,et al v. Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penobscot Bay Tractor Tug Co.
Represented By: Gregory George Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XL Specialty Insurance Co..
Represented By: Gregory George Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XL Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregory George Barnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CAILLOU ISLAND TOWING CO. INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virgie Cenac M/V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caillou Island Towing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Miles C. Thomas
Represented By: Lorin Rebekah Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Tugboat VIRGIE CENAC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?