Andersen v. Standard Insurance Company
Plaintiff: David Andersen
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01704
Filed: June 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Eldon E Fallon
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Standard Insurance Company on 6/15/2020, answer due 8/14/2020. (Toledano, Reagan)
June 22, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Standard Insurance Company served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (Toledano, Reagan)
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Standard Insurance Company. (jeg)
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (cc)
June 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Standard Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8352310) filed by David Andersen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Reagan Levert Toledano added to party David Andersen(pty:pla).(Toledano, Reagan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andersen v. Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Andersen
Represented By: Reagan Levert Toledano
Represented By: James Frederick Willeford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?