Menendez v. Capers, et al
Plaintiff: Jonah Menendez
Defendant: Portier, LLC, EAN Holdings, LLC doing business as Enterprise Rent A Car, United Financial Casualty Company, Lizzie Capers and Elco Claims Services Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv01797
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Dwayne Burrell in re: Service of Lizzie Capers (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Burrell, Dwayne)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by Portier, LLC.(Cannone, Francis)
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by United Financial Casualty Company.(Crews, Chelsea)
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Compliance by Portier, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cannone, Francis)
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 Request by United Financial Casualty Company for Notice (Giordano, Charles)
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by United Financial Casualty Company (Giordano, Charles)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by United Financial Casualty Company.(Giordano, Charles)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 Directive by the Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Portier, LLC. (pp)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (ess)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2020-03368 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8371862) filed by Portier, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Petition for Damages, #3 Exhibit Consent to Removal (UFC Liability), #4 Exhibit Consent to Removal (UFC UM), #5 Exhibit Consent to Removal (EAN Holdings), #6 Exhibit Consent to Removal (ELCO), #7 Exhibit Medical Records)Attorney Francis Christopher Cannone added to party Portier, LLC(pty:dft).(Cannone, Francis) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/25/2020) (pp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Menendez v. Capers, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portier, LLC
Represented By: Francis Christopher Cannone
Represented By: Jared A. Davidson
Represented By: Paula Marcello Wellons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAN Holdings, LLC doing business as Enterprise Rent A Car
Represented By: Bryce David Cohen
Represented By: David P. Salley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Financial Casualty Company
Represented By: Chelsea Coleman Crews
Represented By: Richard D. Serio, Jr.
Represented By: Dianna Duffy Willem
Represented By: Charles V. Giordano
Represented By: Jairo F. Sanchez
Represented By: Michael E. Escudier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lizzie Capers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elco Claims Services Company
Represented By: Bryce David Cohen
Represented By: David P. Salley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonah Menendez
Represented By: Dwayne Burrell
Represented By: Allen Clark Burrell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?