Roe v. Catholic Charities Archdiocese of New Orleans et al
Plaintiff: Ralph Roe
Defendant: Catholic Charities Archdiocese of New Orleans and Harold Thomas Ehlinger
Case Number: 2:2020cv01829
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1452a
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: GRANTING #9 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney William P. Gibbens for Harold Thomas Ehlinger. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 8/18/2020. (am)
August 17, 2020 Filing 9 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record by Harold Thomas Ehlinger. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney William P. Gibbens added to party Harold Thomas Ehlinger(pty:dft).(Gibbens, William)
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #5 Notice of Compliance. Attachments were submitted on legal sized paper, and those documents must be reduced to 8.5 x 11 prior to converting to PDF format via LR10.1. Clerk took corrective action by reducing the page size and replacing the images. No further action necessary. (sa)
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Ralph Roe Statement Regarding Notice of Removal. (Gisleson, Soren)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Catholic Charities Archdiocese of New Orleans of Proceeding Subject to Automatic Reference to Bankruptcy Judge Pursuant to Local Rule 83.4.1. (DeShazo, Michael)
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Compliance by Catholic Charities Archdiocese of New Orleans re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Pleadings)(DeShazo, Michael) (Attachment 1 replaced legal sized images on 7/2/2020) (sa).
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REALLOTTING CASE. Judge Sarah S. Vance recused. Case reassigned to Judge Barry W Ashe. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 6/29/2020. (NEF: DJ, MJ)(mm)
June 29, 2020 Filing 3 Directive by the Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Catholic Charities Archdiocese of New Orleans. (pp)
June 29, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Sarah S. Vance and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (go)
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2020-4848 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8376083) filed by Catholic Charities Archdiocese of New Orleans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Michael L. DeShazo added to party Catholic Charities Archdiocese of New Orleans(pty:dft).(DeShazo, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roe v. Catholic Charities Archdiocese of New Orleans et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Charities Archdiocese of New Orleans
Represented By: Michael L. DeShazo
Represented By: Christine Wadkins Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Thomas Ehlinger
Represented By: William P. Gibbens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Roe
Represented By: Richard Charles Trahant
Represented By: Soren Erik Gisleson
Represented By: John H Denenea, Jr
Represented By: Joseph Edward Cain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?