Sadeghi et al v. United HealthCare Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: PATIENT JB, TAYLOR THEUNISSEN and alireza sadeghi
Defendant: United HealthCare Insurance Company, MORGAN STANLEY HEALTH BENEFITS AND INSURANCE COMPANY and Morgan Stanley Health Benefits and Insurance Plan
Case Number: 2:2020cv01846
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1362
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Morgan Stanley Health Benefits and Insurance Plan. (cg)
July 10, 2020 Filing 6 Request of Summons Issued as to Morgan Stanley Health Benefits and Insurance Plan filed by All Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint,. (Hand, Kernan)
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United HealthCare Insurance Company. (cg)
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 Request of Summons Issued as to Morgan Stanley Health Benefits and Insurance Policy, United HealthCare Insurance Company filed by Taylor Theunissen, Alireza Sadeghi re #1 Complaint,. (Hand, Kernan) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/2/2020) (cg).
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (aj)
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet Submitted (Hand, Kernan)
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Morgan Stanley Health Benefits and Insurance Policy, United HealthCare Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8380126) filed by Alireza Sadeghi and Taylor Theunissen. Attorney Kernan A. Hand, Jr added to party Taylor Theunissen(pty:pla), Attorney Kernan A. Hand, Jr added to party Alireza Sadeghi(pty:pla).(Hand, Kernan) Modified text on 7/1/2020 (pp).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sadeghi et al v. United HealthCare Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATIENT JB
Represented By: Kernan A. Hand, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAYLOR THEUNISSEN
Represented By: Kernan A. Hand, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: alireza sadeghi
Represented By: Kernan A. Hand, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United HealthCare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MORGAN STANLEY HEALTH BENEFITS AND INSURANCE COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Health Benefits and Insurance Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?