Hotard v. Avondale Industries, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Paul Hotard
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., Eagle, Inc., McCarty Corporation, Avondale Industries, Inc., Eagle Asbestos & Packing Company, Inc., Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc., Lamorak Insurance Company, Northrop Grumman Ship Systems, Inc. and Avondale Shipyards, Inc
Cross Defendant: McCarty
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
3Rd Party Defendant: ViacomCBS Inc, Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Viacom Inc, General Electric Company, Hopeman Brothers, Inc., Westinghouse Electric Corporation, National Automotive Parts Association, LLC, Uniroyal Holding, Inc., CBS Corporation, Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, Honeywell International Inc., International Paper Company, Midas International, LLC, Genuine Parts Company and Bayer Cropscience LP
Case Number: 2:2020cv01877
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Nannette Jolivette Brown
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER AND REASONS DENYING #5 Emergency Motion to Remand, as set forth in document. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 8/28/2020. (jls)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ANSWER to #14 Third Party Complaint, by Uniroyal Holding, Inc. (Arthur, Mary) Modified text on 8/24/2020 (jls).
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 **DEFICIENT** ANSWER to 14 Third Party Complaint, by Uniroyal Holding, Inc. Attorney Mary Reeves Arthur added to party Uniroyal Holding, Inc.(pty:3pd).(Arthur, Mary) Modified text on 8/21/2020 (jls). Modified on 8/21/2020 (jls).
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Summons Issued as to Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust. (jls)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING #38 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC is granted an additional twenty-one days to file responsive pleadings to the #14 third-party complaint filed by Defendant Huntington Ingalls Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 8/18/2020. (jls)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING #37 Motion to Substitute Counsel. Attorney Francis Christopher Cannone hereby enrolled as additional counsel of record for Lamorak Insurance Company in place of Adam D. deMahy. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 8/18/2020. (jls)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by International Paper Company (Penn, Elizabeth)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ANSWER to #14 Third Party Complaint of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, by International Paper Company. Attorney Elizabeth Riddell Penn added to party International Paper Company(pty:3pd).(Penn, Elizabeth) Modified text on 8/19/2020 (jls).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Request of Summons Issued as to Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust filed by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. re #45 Answer to Third Party Complaint, Crossclaim. (Ankersen, Brittney)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ANSWER to #14 Third Party Complaint of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, and CROSSCLAIM against Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. (Ankersen, Brittney) Modified text on 8/19/2020 (jls).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Hopeman Brothers, Inc. (Ankersen, Brittney)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by ViacomCBS Inc. identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc. for ViacomCBS Inc. (Long, Kelly) Modified text/filer on 8/18/2020 (jls).
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ANSWER to #14 Third Party Complaint, with Jury Demand by ViacomCBS Inc. Attorney Kelly L. Long added to party CBS Corporation(pty:3pd).(Long, Kelly) Modified text/filer on 8/18/2020 (jls).
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Honeywell International Inc. (McMillan, Sarah)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ANSWER to #14 Third Party Complaint, with Jury Demand by Honeywell International Inc. Attorney Sarah Elizabeth McMillan added to party Honeywell International Inc.(pty:3pd).(McMillan, Sarah) Modified text on 8/14/2020 (jls).
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bridgestone Americas, Inc., and Corporate Parent Bridgestone Corporation for Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. (Simpson, John) Modified text on 8/14/2020 (cwa).
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 EXPARTE/CONSENT First MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney John J. Simpson added to party Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC(pty:3pd).(Simpson, John) Modified text on 8/14/2020 (cwa).
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Francis C. Connone to be substituted in place of Adam D. deMahy by Lamorak Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Samuel Milton Rosamond, III added to party Lamorak Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Rosamond, Samuel)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by General Electric Company (Long, Kelly)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ANSWER to #14 Third Party Complaint, by General Electric Company. Attorney Kelly L. Long added to party General Electric Company(pty:3pd).(Long, Kelly) Modified text on 8/11/2020 (jls).
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ANSWER to #2 Crossclaim of Huntington Ingalls Incorporated by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. Attorney Christopher Kelly Lightfoot added to party Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.(pty:crd).(Lightfoot, Christopher) Modified text on 7/22/2020 (jls).
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal, Petition for Damages by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher) Modified text on 7/22/2020 (jls).
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Lightfoot, Christopher)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #5 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Boyd, Erin) Modified text on 7/22/2020 (jls).
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Notice of Compliance re #1 Notice of Removal by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated pursuant to #4 Directive. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings)(Boyd, Erin) Modified text on 7/20/2020 (jls).
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Third-Party Summons Issued as to Bayer Cropscience LP, Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, CBS Corporation, General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Honeywell International Inc., Hopeman Brothers, Inc., International Paper Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, Midas International, LLC, National Automotive Parts Association, LLC, Uniroyal Holding, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(mp)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Request of Summons Issued as to Uniroyal Holding, Inc. filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #14 Third Party Complaint,,. (Gillen, Laura)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Request of Summons Issued as to National Automotive Parts Association, LLC filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #14 Third Party Complaint,,. (Gillen, Laura)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Request of Summons Issued as to Midas International, LLC filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #14 Third Party Complaint,,. (Gillen, Laura)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Request of Summons Issued as to Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #14 Third Party Complaint,,. (Gillen, Laura)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Request of Summons Issued as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #14 Third Party Complaint,,. (Gillen, Laura)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Request of Summons Issued as to International Paper Company filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #14 Third Party Complaint,,. (Gillen, Laura)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Request of Summons Issued as to Hopeman Brothers, Inc. filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #14 Third Party Complaint,,. (Gillen, Laura)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Request of Summons Issued as to Honeywell International Inc. filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #14 Third Party Complaint,,. (Gillen, Laura)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Request of Summons Issued as to Genuine Parts Company filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #14 Third Party Complaint,,. (Gillen, Laura)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Request of Summons Issued as to General Electric Company filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #14 Third Party Complaint,,. (Gillen, Laura)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Request of Summons Issued as to CBS Corporation filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #14 Third Party Complaint,,. (Gillen, Laura)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Request of Summons Issued as to Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #14 Third Party Complaint,,. (Gillen, Laura)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Request of Summons Issued as to Bayer Cropscience LP filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #14 Third Party Complaint,,. (Gillen, Laura)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #14 Third Party Complaint. **If filing attorney would like summons to be issued, please submit prepared Third Party Summons forms for each party using the event Summons Submitted for Issuance. These forms can be found on the Court's website under Civil Summons & Waiver of Service forms, identified as AO 441.** (jls)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Bayer Cropscience LP, Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC, CBS Corporation, General Electric Company, Genuine Parts Company, Honeywell International Inc., Hopeman Brothers, Inc., International Paper Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust, Midas International, LLC, National Automotive Parts Association, LLC, Uniroyal Holding, Inc. filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated.(Gillen, Laura) Modified text on 7/17/2020 (jls).
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (jls)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #11 Request for Summons Issued. **Summons form was not properly formatted. When using a form, please be sure to print the form to pdf prior to filing. Clerk took corrective action and replaced the attachment.** (jls)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Request of Summons Issued as to Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #2 Answer and Crossclaim. (Gillen, Laura) (Main Document 11 replaced on 7/16/2020) (jls). Modified on 7/16/2020 (jls).
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 Request for Summons Issued, #6 Request for Summons Issued, #8 Request for Summons Issued. Incorrect Caption-The case caption of all future filings should remain as pleadings were captioned in state court. (cwa)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Eagle, Inc., McCarty Corporation, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(cwa)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Request of Summons Issued as to McCarty Corporation filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #2 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. (Gillen, Laura) Modified text on 7/10/2020 (cwa).
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Request of Summons Issued as to Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc. filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #2 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. (Gillen, Laura) Modified text on 7/10/2020 (cwa).
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Request of Summons Issued as to Eagle, Inc. filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated re #2 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal, Crossclaim. (Gillen, Laura) Modified text on 7/10/2020 (cwa).
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Emergency MOTION to Remand to State Court by Paul Hotard. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Hoffman, Philip)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DIRECTIVE OF THE CLERK regarding compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. Issued by the Clerk.(jls)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (go)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand, and CROSSCLAIM with Jury Demand against Eagle, Inc., McCarty Corporation, Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc., by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Boyd, Erin) Modified text/party name on 7/6/2020 (jls).
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2020-5308 D-12 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8384766) filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)Attorney Erin Helen Boyd added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft).(Boyd, Erin) (Main Document 1 replaced to correct case caption on 7/6/2020) (jls).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hotard v. Avondale Industries, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Hotard
Represented By: Frank J. Swarr
Represented By: Mickey P. Landry
Represented By: Matthew C. Clark
Represented By: Philip C Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Huntington Ingalls Incorporated
Represented By: Erin Helen Boyd
Represented By: Laura M. Gillen
Represented By: Brian C. Bossier
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Grace, III
Represented By: Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III
Represented By: Whitney Charmaine Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Kelly Lightfoot
Represented By: Edward J. Lassus, Jr.
Represented By: Richard J. Garvey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle, Inc.
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCarty Corporation
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avondale Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Erin Helen Boyd
Represented By: Laura M. Gillen
Represented By: Brian C. Bossier
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Grace, III
Represented By: Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III
Represented By: Whitney Charmaine Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Asbestos & Packing Company, Inc.
Represented By: Louis Oliver Oubre
Represented By: Susan Beth Kohn
Represented By: James R. Guidry
Represented By: Douglas Kinler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Shipbuilding, Inc.
Represented By: Erin Helen Boyd
Represented By: Laura M. Gillen
Represented By: Brian C. Bossier
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Grace, III
Represented By: Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III
Represented By: Whitney Charmaine Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamorak Insurance Company
Represented By: Samuel Milton Rosamond, III
Represented By: Francis Christopher Cannone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Ship Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Erin Helen Boyd
Represented By: Laura M. Gillen
Represented By: Brian C. Bossier
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Grace, III
Represented By: Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III
Represented By: Whitney Charmaine Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avondale Shipyards, Inc
Represented By: Erin Helen Boyd
Represented By: Laura M. Gillen
Represented By: Brian C. Bossier
Represented By: Christopher Thomas Grace, III
Represented By: Edwin A. Ellinghausen, III
Represented By: Whitney Charmaine Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: ViacomCBS Inc
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Bridgestone Americas Tire Operations, LLC
Represented By: John J. Simpson
Represented By: Benjamin J. Guilbeau, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Viacom Inc
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Hopeman Brothers, Inc.
Represented By: Blaine Augusta Moore
Represented By: Brittney Bullock Ankersen
Represented By: Jeffrey Matthew Burg
Represented By: Kaye N. Courington
Represented By: Mathilde Villere Semmes
Represented By: Troy Nathan Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: National Automotive Parts Association, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Uniroyal Holding, Inc.
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: John Joseph Hainkel, III
Represented By: Lacey Taylor McCoy
Represented By: Kelsey A. Eagan
Represented By: Angela M. Bowlin
Represented By: Roth Martin Hainkel
Represented By: James H. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Magali Ann Puente-Martin
Represented By: Kelly L. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Manville Personal Injury Settlement Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Represented By: Deirdre Claire McGlinchey
Represented By: Mark N. Bodin
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: International Paper Company
Represented By: Elizabeth Riddell Penn
Represented By: Mary Reeves Arthur
Represented By: Walter G. Watkins, III
Represented By: Thomas Peyton Smith
Represented By: Daniel S Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Midas International, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Genuine Parts Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Bayer Cropscience LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?