Fannaly v. LEI, Inc.
Plaintiff: Lawrence Fannaly, III
Defendant: LEI, Inc. and Lamp Recyclers of Louisiana, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv01940
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Mary Ann Vial Lemmon
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Continue ERISA Case Management Order Deadlines. All deadlines set forth in the current #5 ERISA Case Management Order are continued pending a ruling on the #9 Motion to Remand, with the new deadlines set to run from the date of said ruling. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 8/18/2020. (sbs)
August 17, 2020 Filing 15 EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Continue ERISA Case Management Order Deadlines by Lawrence Fannaly, III, LEI, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McGoey, Thomas) Modified text, added filer on 8/18/2020 (sbs).
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: A Settlement Conference is set for 12/3/2020 10:00 AM before Chief Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. All lead counsel are ordered to appear BY VIDEO. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby.(mp)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File Exhibits to Declaration Under Seal re #9 MOTION to Remand. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 8/7/2020. (sbs)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - Defendant's #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Stay, scheduled for submission on August 19, 2020 is continued to September 16, 2020. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 8/7/2020.(sbs)
August 6, 2020 Filing 11 Request/Statement of Oral Argument by Lawrence Fannaly, III regarding #9 MOTION to Remand. (Demmons, Larry) Modified text on 8/7/2020 (sbs).
August 6, 2020 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Exhibits to Declaration Under Seal re #9 MOTION to Remand by Lawrence Fannaly, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Demmons, Larry) Modified text on 8/7/2020 (sbs). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2020: #2 2013 W-2, #3 2014 W-2) (sbs).
August 6, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand by Lawrence Fannaly, III. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Notice of Submission)(Demmons, Larry) Modified text on 8/7/2020 (sbs). (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2020: #5 2013 W-2, #6 2014 W-2) (sbs).
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Compliance re #1 Notice of Removal, by LEI, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(McGoey, Thomas) Modified text on 8/5/2020 (sbs).
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Stay by LEI, Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(McGoey, Thomas) Modified text on 7/17/2020 (sbs).
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by LEI, Inc. (McGoey, Thomas)
July 10, 2020 Filing 5 ERISA CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Clerk. (sbs)
July 10, 2020 Filing 4 DIRECTIVE OF THE CLERK regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by LEI, Inc. By the Clerk.(sbs)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 Notice to Adverse Parties of Removal by LEI, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Notice to State Court of Removal)(McGoey, Thomas) Modified text on 7/10/2020 (sbs).
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (ess)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2020-03954 "J-15" (Filing fee $400 receipt number ALAEDC-8394228) filed by LEI, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings)Attorney Thomas J. McGoey, II added to party LEI, Inc.(pty:dft).(McGoey, Thomas) Modified text on 7/10/2020 (sbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fannaly v. LEI, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEI, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J. McGoey, II
Represented By: Courtney Harper Turkington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lamp Recyclers of Louisiana, Inc.
Represented By: Courtney Harper Turkington
Represented By: Thomas J. McGoey, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Fannaly, III
Represented By: Larry E. Demmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?