Brightergy Louisiana, LLC v. GalCan Electric & General Contracting, LLC
Plaintiff: Brightergy Louisiana, LLC and Influent Energy
3Rd Party Plaintiff: GalCan Electric & General Contracting, LLC
3Rd Party Defendant: Regional Transit Authority of New Orleans, Unidentified Party and Entergy New Orleans, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02018
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
2 Judge: Jay C Zainey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GalCan Electric & General Contracting, LLC re #6 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, . (Council, Benny)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 Request of Summons Issued as to Entergy New Orleans, Inc. filed by GalCan Electric & General Contracting, LLC re #6 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Counterclaim,,. (Council, Benny)
September 11, 2020 Filing 8 Request of Summons Issued as to Regional Transit Authority of New Orleans filed by GalCan Electric & General Contracting, LLC re #6 Answer to Complaint,,, Third Party Complaint,,, Counterclaim,,. (Council, Benny)
September 8, 2020 Filing 7 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #6 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint, Counterclaim. ***The Caption should remain the same as the Original Complaint. The Caption can only be changed by Order of the Court. For future filings, please remove Third Parties and Counter-claimants/parties from the Caption. ALSO, document does not contain the Section and Magistrate Judges. All future pleadings must reflect Section "A" Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate (2) Donna Phillips Currault.*** (ajn)
September 7, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Regional Transit Authority of New Orleans, Entergy New Orleans, Inc., COUNTERCLAIM with Jury Demand against Regional Transit Authority of New Orleans, Entergy New Orleans, Inc. by GalCan Electric & General Contracting, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Benny D. Council added to party GalCan Electric & General Contracting, LLC(pty:dft).(Council, Benny)
August 5, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; GalCan Electric & General Contracting, LLC served on 8/3/2020, answer due 8/24/2020. (Cerise, Charles)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld recused. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 7/16/2020. (NEF: Judge Currault)(ajn)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to GalCan Electric & General Contracting, LLC. (ajn)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Jay C. Zainey and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (go)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against GalCan Electric & General Contracting, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8404155) filed by Brightergy Louisiana, LLC, Influent Energy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)Attorney Charles A. Cerise, Jr added to party Brightergy Louisiana, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Charles A. Cerise, Jr added to party Influent Energy(pty:pla).(Cerise, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brightergy Louisiana, LLC v. GalCan Electric & General Contracting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brightergy Louisiana, LLC
Represented By: Charles A. Cerise, Jr.
Represented By: James T. Rogers, III
Represented By: Luke Gerard LaHaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Influent Energy
Represented By: Charles A. Cerise, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: GalCan Electric & General Contracting, LLC
Represented By: Benny D. Council
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Regional Transit Authority of New Orleans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Unidentified Party
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Entergy New Orleans, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?