Gabriel v. Offshore Service Vessels, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Floyd W Gabriel
Defendant: Galliano Marine Services, LLC, Offshore Service Vessels, LLC and Legacy Leader, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv02030
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:30104
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Legacy Leader, LLC. (clc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Galliano Marine Services, LLC, Legacy Leader, LLC filed by Floyd W Gabriel.(clc)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 8/28/2020. (clc)
August 28, 2020 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental and Amending Complaint. **Filing attorney incorrectly changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the District Judge. Clerk took corrective action.** (am)
August 28, 2020 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File First Supplemental and Amending Complaint by Floyd W Gabriel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Moroux, Jerome) Modified text on 8/28/2020 (am).
July 24, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Galliano Marine Services, LLC served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020; Offshore Service Vessels, LLC served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Moroux, Jerome) Modified text on 7/24/2020 (clc).
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 **DEFICIENT**SUMMONS Returned Executed; Galliano Marine Services, LLC served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020; Offshore Service Vessels, LLC served on 7/20/2020, answer due 8/10/2020. (Moroux, Jerome) Modified on text 7/24/2020 (am).
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Summonst. The pdf should not have the purple fillable boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk took corrective action.** (am)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Galliano Marine Services, LLC, Offshore Service Vessels, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(am)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 SEAMAN COMPLAINT against Galliano Marine Services, LLC, Offshore Service Vessels, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8406020) filed by Floyd W Gabriel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)Attorney Jerome H. Moroux added to party Floyd W Gabriel(pty:pla).(Moroux, Jerome) Modified text on 7/17/2020 (am). (Attachment 2 replaced on 7/17/2020) (am). (Attachment 3 replaced on 7/17/2020) (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gabriel v. Offshore Service Vessels, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galliano Marine Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Offshore Service Vessels, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Legacy Leader, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd W Gabriel
Represented By: Jerome H. Moroux
Represented By: Scott Michael Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?