Lewis v. Jefferson Parish et al
Plaintiff: Leo Lewis
Defendant: Mr Julio Alvarado, Mr Nicholas Broussard, Kurt Zeagler, Jefferson Parish, Sheriff Joseph Lopinto, III, Mr Wayne Rumore, Mr Braedon Cohen, Jefferson Parish Sheriff's Office, Donald Clogher, Julio Alvarado, Joseph P. Lopinto, III, Nicholas Broussard, Wayne Rumore and Braedon Cohen
Case Number: 2:2020cv02032
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Barry W Ashe
Referring Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: GRANTING #8 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Christopher Szeto,Shermin S. Khan for Leo Lewis. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 09/03/2020. (am)
September 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Jefferson Parish. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Smith, W.) Modified text on 9/4/2020 (am).
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Christopher Szeto and Shermin Khan by Leo Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dunbar, Ian) Modified text on 9/3/2020 (am).
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Jefferson Parish answer due 9/11/2020. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 8/28/2020. (am)
August 21, 2020 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Jefferson Parish. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney W. Reed Smith added to party Jefferson Parish(pty:dft).(Smith, W.)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, . ORDERED that the defendant, Sheriff Joseph P. Lopinto, III, is hereby granted a twenty (20) day extension of time within which to file responsive pleadings to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 8/3/2020. (clc)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, by Joseph P. Lopinto, III. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Daniel Rault Martiny added to party Joseph P. Lopinto, III(pty:dft).(Martiny, Daniel)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Julio Alvarado, Nicholas Broussard, Donald Clogher, Braedon Cohen, Jefferson Parish, Jefferson Parish Sheriff's Office, Joseph P. Lopinto, III, Wayne Rumore, Kurt Zeagler. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons)(am)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Barry W Ashe and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (ess)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8406427) filed by Leo Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Ian Dunbar added to party Leo Lewis(pty:pla).(Dunbar, Ian) (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/20/2020) (am).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Jefferson Parish et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Julio Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Nicholas Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurt Zeagler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Parish
Represented By: W. Reed Smith
Represented By: Victoria Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Joseph Lopinto, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Wayne Rumore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr Braedon Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson Parish Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Clogher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julio Alvarado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph P. Lopinto, III
Represented By: Jeffrey David Martiny
Represented By: Daniel Rault Martiny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Broussard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Rumore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Braedon Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leo Lewis
Represented By: Ian Dunbar
Represented By: Christopher Szeto
Represented By: Shermin S. Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?