Duplantis v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dylan Duplantis
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production, Inc., Valaris, PLC and ENSCO Offshore Company
Not Classified By Court: Valaris plc
Case Number: 2:2020cv02044
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Donna Phillips Currault
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 43:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER STAYING CASE - Considering the Suggestion of Bankruptcy filed by Valaris plc (Rec. Doc. 19), and the automatic stay provision of 11 U.S.C. 362, IT IS ORDERED that the above-captioned matters are STAYED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall mark these actions closed for statistical purposes. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court shall retain jurisdiction and that the cases shall be restored to the trial docket upon motion of a party if circumstances change so that they may proceed to final disposition; this order shall not prejudice the rights of the parties to this litigation. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 8/26/20.(cg)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - It having come to the Court's attention that C.A. No. 20-1627, Dylan Duplantis v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc., et al., is related to the above case, IT IS ORDERED that the above matters are hereby CONSOLIDATED. Pursuant to the Court's directive, all pleadings hereafter filed in this consolidated proceeding shall bear the caption of the Master consolidated case, 20-1627. as stated herein. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 7/24/20.(cg)
July 20, 2020 Filing 4 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Valaris plc. Corporate Parent ENSCO Holding Company (Kraft, Ralph) Modified on 7/21/2020 (cg).
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Carl Barbier and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (cc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Consent to Removal by Valaris plc Attorney Ralph E. Kraft added to party Valaris plc(pty:selreq).(Kraft, Ralph)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8408186) filed by BP Exploration & Production, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Salvador Joseph Pusateri added to party BP Exploration & Production, Inc.(pty:selreq).(Pusateri, Salvador)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Duplantis v. BP Exploration & Production, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dylan Duplantis
Represented By: Edward James Gaidry, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP Exploration & Production, Inc.
Represented By: Salvador Joseph Pusateri
Represented By: Aaron Benjamin Greenbaum
Represented By: Rowen Fricker Asprodites
Represented By: Marcus Kelsey Pierre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valaris, PLC
Represented By: Ralph E. Kraft
Represented By: Bryan Edward Lege
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ENSCO Offshore Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Valaris plc
Represented By: Ralph E. Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?