Terrebonne v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Steven Paul Terrebonne
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 2:2020cv02050
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Karen Wells Roby
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2020 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(mp)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (mp)
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Western; Case Number 2:20-cv-00892. Electronic file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received (mp)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 7/17/2020. (crt,Taylor, L) [Transferred from lawd on 7/20/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S.D.C. Eastern District of Louisiana by Steven Paul Terrebonne. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Misko, Benjamin) [Transferred from lawd on 7/20/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Deficiency to Benjamin M Misko on behalf of Steven Paul Terrebonne regarding #4 DEFICIENT? MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S.D.C. Eastern District of Louisiana. Reason: Either no proposed order accompanied this motion or the proposed order was not on a separate page. Please see LR7.4.1 or LR58.1 for additional information. The motion cannot be referred to chambers until this deficiency is corrected. (crt,Taylor, L) [Transferred from lawd on 7/20/2020.]
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 DEFICIENT MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S.D.C. Eastern District of Louisiana by Steven Paul Terrebonne. Motions referred to Kathleen Kay. (aty,Misko, Benjamin) Modified on 7/16/2020 to reflect submission as Deficient (Taylor, L). Modified on 7/17/2020 to terminate motion - see doc #6 Motion to Transfer Case w/proposed Order (Taylor, L). [Transferred from lawd on 7/20/2020.]
July 15, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Dauterive, C) [Transferred from lawd on 7/20/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Edward A. Wicklundto Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-4323461) by Steven Paul Terrebonne. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(aty,Misko, Benjamin) [Transferred from lawd on 7/20/2020.]
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steven Paul Terrebonne. Motion(s) referred to Karen Wells Roby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Misko, Benjamin) [Transferred from lawd on 7/20/2020.] Modified referral on 7/20/2020 (mp).
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (In Forma Pauperis status requested and/or granted) filed by Steven Paul Terrebonne. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Attorney Benjamin M Misko added to party Steven Paul Terrebonne(pty:pla))(aty,Misko, Benjamin) [Transferred from lawd on 7/20/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Terrebonne v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Paul Terrebonne
Represented By: Benjamin M. Misko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?