Koeppel Clark LLC, et al v. Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Plaintiff: Beko Properties, LLC and Koeppel Clark LLC
Defendant: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv02055
Filed: July 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, as to Starr Indemnity & Liability Company answer due 9/28/2020. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 09/16/2020. (ko)
August 31, 2020 Filing 6 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings re #1 Complaint by Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order) Attorney Leah Nunn Engelhardt added to party Starr Indemnity & Liability Company(pty:dft).(Engelhardt, Leah)
July 29, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed; Starr Indemnity & Liability Company served on 7/25/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Clark, William)
July 21, 2020 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. 1. Attorney submitted a complaint with et al in the caption. Clerk requested corrected complaint. Clerk has replaced original complaint with new complaint provided. 2. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of attachment 4. The pdf should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (mm)
July 21, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Starr Indemnity & Liability Company. (mm)
July 20, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc)
July 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Starr Indemnity & Liability Company (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8409638) filed by Koeppel Clark LLC, Beko Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Notice of Lawsuit, #4 Waiver of Service of Summons) Attorney William Scarth Clark added to party Beko Properties, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney William Scarth Clark added to party Koeppel Clark LLC(pty:pla).(Clark, William) (Attachment 4 replaced on 7/21/2020) (mm). (Main Document 1 replaced on 7/21/2020) (mm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koeppel Clark LLC, et al v. Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beko Properties, LLC
Represented By: William Scarth Clark
Represented By: Peter Stephan Koeppel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Koeppel Clark LLC
Represented By: William Scarth Clark
Represented By: Peter Stephan Koeppel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
Represented By: Thomas H. Prince
Represented By: Charles D. Marshall, III
Represented By: Leah Nunn Engelhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?