Romious et al v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Romious, Sr. and Zanab Hadad
Defendant: Alexis Collins, Cynthia Lee-Cheng, John Bel Edwards, Brian Williams and Courtney N Phillips
Case Number: 2:2020cv02066
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Carl Barbier
Referring Judge: Janis van Meerveld
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Collateral Proceeding filed in State Court by Zanab Hadad, Carlos Romious, Sr. (pp)
September 10, 2020 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to Alexis Collins, John Bel Edwards, Cynthia Lee-Cheng, Courtney N Phillips, Brian Williams. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons) (mailed to plaintiff's w/Cert. Pauper Order, Pauper Letter, Complaints and Order to Issue Summons) (ajn) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/10/2020: #5 Pauper Letter) (ajn).
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to issue summons to the defendants named in the Amended Complaint; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's #14 Motion for Order Directing Clerk to Issue Summons is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 9/10/2020. (ajn)
September 4, 2020 Filing 14 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Order Directing Clerk to Issue Summonses by All Plaintiffs. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (cg)
August 27, 2020 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Alexis Collins, John Bel Edwards, Cynthia Lee-Cheng, Courtney N Phillips, Brian Williams filed by Carlos Romious, Sr, Zanab Hadad.(cwa)
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 8/25/2020. (cwa)
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 Request of Summons Issued as to Brian Williams filed by Carlos Romious, Sr, Zanab Hadad regarding the Amended Complaint (cg)
August 24, 2020 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Zanab Hadad, Carlos Romious, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order)(cg)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by All Plaintiffs (cg)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe DOCUMENT: re #7 Motion for Leave to File Document. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 9/11/2020. (cg)
August 21, 2020 Filing 7 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Zanab Hadad, Carlos Romious, Sr. (cg)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS ORDERED that #3 and #4 MOTIONS for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis are GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to withhold issuance of summons until further order of the Court. Plaintiff's are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE by Wednesday, 9/9/2020 as to why this case should not be summarily dismissed under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(i-iii) for failing to state a claim on which relief may be granted. IT IS ORDERED that on or before Wednesday, 9/2/2020, plaintiffs Romious and Hadad shall file a response containing a written statement of their position concerning this Court's Order to Show Cause as set out in document. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that there will be NO ORAL HEARING, and the matter will be deemed under advisement on the briefs on 9/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld on 8/5/2020.(ajn)
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Alexis Collins, John Bel Edwards, Cynthia Lee-Cheng, Courtney N Phillips, Brian Williams filed by Carlos Romious, Sr, Zanab Hadad. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(pp)
July 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT ProSe COMPLAINT: re #1 Complaint. Please see attached letter for steps needed to remedy deficiency. Deficiency remedy due by 8/13/2020. (pp)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Zanab Hadad. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (pp)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carlos Romious, Sr. Motion(s) referred to Janis van Meerveld. (pp)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 **DEFICIENT** COMPLAINT with jury demand against Alexis Collins, John Bel Edwards, Cynthia Lee-Cheng, Courtney N Phillips, Brian Williams filed by Carlos Romious, Sr, Zanab Hadad. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(pp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romious et al v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexis Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Lee-Cheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Bel Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney N Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Romious, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zanab Hadad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?