Sika Investments, LLC v. RLI Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Sika Investments, LLC
Defendant: EI Investments, Inc., ARI Underwriters, Inc., Marsh & McLennan Agency, LLC, RLI Corporation d/b/a Mt. Hawley Insurance Company, RLI Corporation doing business as Mt. Hawley Insurance Company, Unidentified Parties and Marsh & McLennan Agency LLC
Intervenor Plaintiff: Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv02074
Filed: July 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Martin LC Feldman
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER AND REASONS - IT IS ORDERED that the #22 MOTION to Continue filed by Sika Investments, LLC is GRANTED. IT IS ORDERED that RLI's #14 Motion to dismiss will be heard on October 28, 2020, on the papers. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/15/2020.(sa)
September 14, 2020 Filing 30 COMPLAINT IN INTERVENTION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF with Jury Demand filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(dw)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING AS UNOPPOSED #15 Mt. Hawley Insurance Company's Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 9/14/2020. (dw)
September 14, 2020 Filing 28 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #27 Response/Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. Document does not contain Section or Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section F and Magistrate (5). (cwa)
September 11, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by RLI Corporation re #22 MOTION to Continue RLI Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(King, Richard)
September 8, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by ARI Underwriters, Inc. re #19 MOTION to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wilty, Reagan) Modified text on 9/8/2020 (cwa).
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the plaintiff's #23 Motion for expedited hearing is hereby GRANTED. The plaintiff's #22 Motion to continue shall be heard on September 16, 2020, on the papers. Any opposition shall be filed not later than 4:00 p.m. on Friday, September 11, 2020. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing on the motions to dismiss and the motion to remand (Rec. Docs. #13 , #14 , #21 , and #19 ) is hereby CONTINUED to September 30, 2020, on the papers, unless otherwise ordered. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 9/8/2020.(sa)
September 8, 2020 Filing 24 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #22 MOTION to Continue RLI Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss.**Filing attorney selected incorrect submission/hearing date. Correct date is 9/30/2020. Clerk took corrective action. No further action necessary.** (pp)
September 4, 2020 Filing 23 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite Motion to Continue RLI Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss by Sika Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Curtis, Martha)
September 4, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Continue RLI Corp.'s Motion to Dismiss by Sika Investments, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Curtis, Martha) Modified text on 9/8/2020 (pp).
September 1, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim & Lack Subject Matter Jurisdiction by ARI Underwriters, Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Wilty, Reagan) Modified text on 9/2/2020 (cwa).
August 21, 2020 Filing 20 Consent and Joinder as plaintiff by RLI Corp. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(King, Richard)
August 20, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Remand by Sika Investments, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Curtis, Martha)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #15 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint in Intervention filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. Because the submission exceeds 50 pages, counsel for Mt. Hawley Insurance Company shall make arrangements with the Court's Case Manager, Dena White, at (504) 589-7719 for delivery of a hard copy of the submission to the Court for its use. The copy must be spiral bound, tabbed, and reflect pagination and document numbers consistent with the electronic document stamping of the CM/ECF system. Counsel for the parties are reminded that any future filings greater than 50 pages in total length shall automatically be subject to the same requirement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael North on 8/19/2020.(dw)
August 19, 2020 Filing 17 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #15 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint in Intervention. Filing attorney should have changed 'N' to 'Y' at the question 'Is this motion to be decided by the Magistrate Judge Y/N?'. This motion will be decided by the magistrate judge. Clerk took corrective action. Additionally, attachments were imaged as 8-1/2" x 14". All documents should be 8-1/2" x 11". Clerk has corrected the images. (cwa)
August 19, 2020 Filing 16 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Attachments were imaged as 8-1/2" x 14". All documents should be 8-1/2" x 11". Clerk has corrected the images. (cwa)
August 18, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Complaint in Intervention by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. Motion(s) referred to Michael North. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Notice of Submission)(King, Richard) (Attachments 3, 5 replaced on 8/19/2020) (cwa). Modified text/filers/referral on 8/19/2020 (cwa).
August 18, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by RLI Corp. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Notice of Submission)(King, Richard) (Attachments 5, 6, 7 replaced on 8/19/2020) (cwa). Modified text on 8/19/2020 (cwa).
August 14, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by EI Investments, Inc., Marsh & McLennan Agency LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 9/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission, #3 Exhibit A)(Teske, Christopher) Modified text on 8/17/2020 (cwa).
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant, RLI Corp., is GRANTED an extension of 21 days, until August 18, 2020, to plead in response to the Plaintiff's complaint. Further extensions will be granted only upon motion and order for good cause shown. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 7/28/2020. (sa)
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer: 1. Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to Notice of Removal. 2. Document does not contain Section and/or Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Section F and Magistrate 5. (ko)
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal by RLI Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Richard E. King added to party RLI Corp.(pty:dft).(King, Richard) Link added on 7/28/2020 (ko).
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by EI Investments, Inc. (Teske, Christopher)
July 24, 2020 Filing 8 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Marsh & McLennan Agency LLC identifying Corporate Parents, Marsh USA, Inc., Marsh, LLC, and Marsh & McLennan Companies, Inc. for Marsh & McLennan Agency LLC (Teske, Christopher) Modified on 7/27/2020 (ko).
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to EI Investments, Inc. and Marsh & McLennan Agency LLC. Answer due date extended through 8/18/2020. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 7/23/2020. (cwa)
July 23, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Compliance by Marsh & McLennan Agency LLC re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B-State Court Service Returns)(Teske, Christopher) Modified text on 7/23/2020 (cwa).
July 23, 2020 Filing 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. Document should have been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking document to document 1. (cwa)
July 22, 2020 Filing 4 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer #1 Notice of Removal Under Local Rule 7.8 by Marsh & McLennan Agency LLC, EI Investments, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Teske, Christopher) Modified text/linkage on 7/23/2020 (cwa).
July 22, 2020 Filing 3 DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal.(cwa)
July 21, 2020 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
July 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 24th Judicial District Court, case number 807-143 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-8412056) filed by Marsh & McLennan Agency, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Christopher R. Teske added to party Marsh & McLennan Agency, LLC(pty:dft).(Teske, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sika Investments, LLC v. RLI Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EI Investments, Inc.
Represented By: Lindsey Margaret Soboul
Represented By: Christopher R. Teske
Represented By: Laura Spansel Gravener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ARI Underwriters, Inc.
Represented By: Reagan Reynolds Wilty
Represented By: George Davidson Fagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsh & McLennan Agency, LLC
Represented By: Christopher R. Teske
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RLI Corporation d/b/a Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RLI Corporation doing business as Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard E. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unidentified Parties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsh & McLennan Agency LLC
Represented By: Lindsey Margaret Soboul
Represented By: Christopher R. Teske
Represented By: Laura Spansel Gravener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sika Investments, LLC
Represented By: Ashley Gremillion Coker
Represented By: Martha Y. Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard E. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?