Clear Blue Specialty Insurance Company v. Landrieu Concrete and Cement Industries LLC
Plaintiff: Clear Blue Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: Landrieu Concrete and Cement Industries LLC, Double R&J Trucking Service, Inc. and Double R & J Trucking Service, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv02120
Filed: July 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Louisiana
Presiding Judge: Greg Gerard Guidry
Referring Judge: Michael North
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2020 Filing 15 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #14 Waiver of Service Executed, #13 Waiver of Service Executed. **Filing attorney did not enter date for the date waiver sent to party. Waiver sent to Landrieu Concrete and Cement Industries LLC on 8/21/2020, answer due 10/20/2020; Waiver sent to Double R & J Trucking Service, Inc. on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. No further action is necessary.** (mm)
September 21, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Double R & J Trucking Service, Inc. on 9/18/2020, answer due 11/17/2020. (Fondren, Frederic) Modified text/added answer due date on 9/21/2020 (mm).
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed; waiver sent to Landrieu Concrete and Cement Industries LLC on 8/21/2020, answer due 10/20/2020. (Fondren, Frederic) Modified text/added answer due date on 9/21/2020 (mm).
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Double R & J Trucking Service, Inc., Landrieu Concrete and Cement Industries LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(mm)
August 20, 2020 Filing 11 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #10 Request for Summons Issued. **Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of the summons. The pdf should not have the blue boxes nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action.** (mm)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 Request of Summons Issued as to Landrieu Concrete and Cement Industries LLC, Double R & J Trucking Service, Inc. filed by Clear Blue Specialty Insurance Company re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons to Landrieu Concrete, #2 Summons to Double R & J)(Fondren, Frederic) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/20/2020) (mm). (Attachment 2 replaced on 8/20/2020) (mm).
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Frederic C., Bobby-Warren Jude Triche for Clear Blue Specialty Insurance Company. Attorney Jennifer E. Michel; Dakota Kyle Chenevert and Mary Kerrigan Dennard terminated. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 08/20/2020. (ko)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #7 MOTION to Withdraw Attorney, MOTION to Substitute Attorney. **Filing attorney selected unnecessary additional event - Motion to Withdraw Attorney. Clerk took corrective action by removing the event.** (mm)
August 18, 2020 Filing 7 EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Clear Blue Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Frederic C. Fondren added to party Clear Blue Specialty Insurance Company(pty:pla).(Fondren, Frederic) Modified text/removed additional event on 8/18/2020 (mm).
August 12, 2020 Filing 6 DEFICIENT: EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Frederic C. Fondren to be substituted in place of Jennifer E. Michel by Clear Blue Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Attorney Frederic C. Fondren added to party Clear Blue Specialty Insurance Company(pty:pla).(Fondren, Frederic) Modified text on 8/12/2020 (mm).
July 27, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Landrieu Concrete and Cement Industries LLC. (lt)
July 27, 2020 Filing 4 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet and Summons. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. (lt)
July 24, 2020 Filing 3 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (ess)
July 24, 2020 Filing fee received from Mary K. Dennard : Receipt LAE062946 $ 400 (cc)
July 24, 2020 Filing 2 Case Filing Fee Not Paid. The mandated filing fee of $400.00 has not been paid. If payment is not received within two business days, the matter will be referred to the assigned judge. (aj)
July 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Double R&J Trucking Service, Inc., Landrieu Concrete and Cement Industries LLC (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) filed by Clear Blue Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summons to LCCI, #4 Summons to R&J Trucking)Attorney Mary Kerrigan Dennard added to party Clear Blue Specialty Insurance Company(pty:pla).(Dennard, Mary) (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/27/2020) (lt). (Attachment 3 replaced on 7/27/2020) (lt). (Attachment 4 replaced on 7/27/2020) (lt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Louisiana Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clear Blue Specialty Insurance Company v. Landrieu Concrete and Cement Industries LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landrieu Concrete and Cement Industries LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Double R&J Trucking Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Double R & J Trucking Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clear Blue Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Mary Kerrigan Dennard
Represented By: Bobby-Warren Jude Triche
Represented By: Dakota Kyle Chenevert
Represented By: Frederic C. Fondren
Represented By: Jennifer E. Michel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?